EP1124650 - INDUCTIVE ENERGY TRANSFER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FKI Logistex A/S P.O. Pedersens Vej 10 8200 Aarhus N. / DK | [2004/26] |
Former [2001/34] | For all designated states CRISPLANT A/S P.O. Pedersens Vej 10 8200 Aarhus N. / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GOERTZ, Ole Engbakken 17 DK-2830 Virum / DK | 02 /
LYKKEGAARD, Uffe Carl Blochs Gade 31, 1. tv. DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | 03 /
LARSEN, Benny Boegevej 5 DK-8543 Hornslet / DK | 04 /
KLOSTER, Aksel Roersangervej 17 DK-8220 Brabrand / DK | 05 /
GLUD, Knud, Erik Tranevej 24 DK-8382 Hinnerup / DK | 06 /
SIMONSEN, Henrik Duch Gl. Skolevej 20, Vrold DK-8660 Skanderborg / DK | [2004/31] |
Former [2001/34] | 01 /
G RTZ, Ole Engbakken 17 DK-2830 Virum / DK | ||
02 /
LYKKEGAARD, Uffe Carl Blochs Gade 31, 1. tv. DK-8000 Aarhus C / DK | |||
03 /
LARSEN, Benny B gevej 5 DK-8543 hORNSLET / DK | |||
04 /
KLOSTER, Aksel R rsangervej 17 DK-8220 Brabrand / DK | |||
05 /
GLUD, Knud, Erik Tranevej 24 DK-8382 Hinnerup / DK | |||
06 /
SIMONSEN, Henrik Duch G1. Skolevej 20, Vrold DK-8660 Skanderborg / DK | Representative(s) | Plougmann Vingtoft a/s Strandvejen 70 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/34] | Plougmann, Vingtoft & Partners A/S Sankt Annae Plads 11, P.O. Box 3007 1021 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 99947808.4 | 20.10.1999 | [2001/34] | WO1999IB01717 | Priority number, date | DK19980000013 | 20.10.1998 Original published format: DK 98013 | [2001/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023203 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1124650 | Date: | 22.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1124650 | Date: | 21.04.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/17] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP1124650 | Date: | 18.08.2004 | [2004/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B07C1/00 | [2001/34] | CPC: |
B65G23/00 (EP,US);
B65G17/345 (EP,US);
B65G2201/02 (EP,US);
B65G2207/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2004/21] |
Former [2001/34] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR INDUKTIVEN ENERGIEÜBERTRAGUNG | [2001/34] | English: | INDUCTIVE ENERGY TRANSFER SYSTEM | [2001/34] | French: | SYSTEME DE TRANSFERT PAR INDUCTION | [2001/34] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/34] | 18.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.12.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 30.12.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2004 | BE | 21.04.2004 | CH | 21.04.2004 | CY | 21.04.2004 | FI | 21.04.2004 | IT | 21.04.2004 | LI | 21.04.2004 | SE | 21.04.2004 | DK | 21.07.2004 | GR | 21.07.2004 | ES | 01.08.2004 | PT | 21.09.2004 | GB | 20.10.2004 | IE | 20.10.2004 | LU | 20.10.2004 | MC | 31.10.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
CY | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
SE | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
LU | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
GB | 20.10.2004 | ||
IE | 20.10.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
MC | 31.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/18] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
DK | 21.07.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/14] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
BE | 21.04.2004 | ||
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 21.04.2004 | |
CH | 21.04.2004 | ||
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
GR | 21.07.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
FI | 21.04.2004 | ||
LI | 21.04.2004 | ||
ES | 01.08.2004 | ||
Former [2004/51] | CH | 21.04.2004 | |
LI | 21.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5701992 (ENOMOTO MASAHIRO [JP]) [X] 1,6-9,12,17,18* column W *; | [E]EP0990604 (BEUMER MASCHF GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [E] 1,7-9,12,18 * the whole document * |