EP1122704 - LABEL FOR IN-MOLD MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yupo Corporation 3, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Yupo Corporation 3, Kandasurugadai 4-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101-0062 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZAWA, Takatoshi Oji-Yuka Synt. Paper Co. Ltd Kashima Kojo 23, Oaza Touwada Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 02 /
SHIINA, Masaki Oji-Yuka Synthetic Paper Co., Ltd. Kashima Kojo 23, Oaza Touwada Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | 03 /
TANIGUCHI, Hironobu Oji-Yuka Synt. Paper Co., Ltd Kashima Kojo 23, Oaza Touwada Kamisu-machi Kashima-gun Ibaraki 314-0102 / JP | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/32] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99947873.8 | 13.10.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999JP05644 | Priority number, date | JP19980293129 | 15.10.1998 Original published format: JP 29312998 | JP19980317422 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: JP 31742298 | [2001/32] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0022601 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1122704 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G09F3/10, B32B27/20 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B32B27/18 (EP,US);
G09F3/10 (KR);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
G09F3/04 (EP,US);
B29C49/24 (EP,US);
B29L2031/744 (EP,US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1352 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24843 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249983 (EP,US);
Y10T428/249985 (EP,US);
Y10T428/25 (EP,US);
Y10T428/252 (EP,US);
Y10T428/254 (EP,US);
Y10T428/256 (EP,US);
Y10T428/257 (EP,US);
Y10T428/258 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/265 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2826 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2848 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2878 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2891 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31504 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31507 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31743 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31746 (EP,US);
Y10T428/3175 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31757 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31909 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31938 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | G09F3/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Title | German: | IN-MOULD-ETIKETT | [2001/32] | English: | LABEL FOR IN-MOLD MOLDING | [2001/32] | French: | ETIQUETTE POUR MOULAGE EN MOULE | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2001 | Translation filed | 23.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 23.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 11.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 06.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 24.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 25.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 16 | 23.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 17 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 18   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0949599 (OJI YUKA SYNT PAPER CO LTD [JP], et al) [E] 1,3-8 * paragraphs [0020] , [0023] , [0068] , [0069] , [0096]; figure 2; claims 1,4-7; table 1 *; | [XA]EP0182463 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,3 * column 2, lines 26,34,35,48,49 - column 3, lines 11,12,18-22; claims 1,3,4,6,8 * * column 3, lines 34-40 * [A] 2; | [X]US5618618 (MURSCHALL URSULA [DE], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 2, lines 29-33 - column 4, lines 2,33-37; claims 1-4,8,14 * * column 5, lines 9-16,31 - column 8, lines 1,8,15; example 1 * | International search | [Y]JPH0429184 (OJI YUKA SYNT PAPER CO LTD); | [Y]JPS62164777 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [Y]JPH09221644 (MITSUBISHI PAPER MILLS LTD); | [Y]JPH0580702 (OJI YUKA SYNT PAPER CO LTD) |