EP1119417 - BOOM SPRAYER AND METHOD OF SPRAYING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.11.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.11.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beggs, Robert D. N6875 5th Avenue Plainfield, WI 54966 / US | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2001/31] | Application number, filing date | 99948215.1 | 15.09.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999US21085 | Priority number, date | US19980100328P | 15.09.1998 Original published format: US 100328 P | US19980176589 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: US 176589 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015348 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119417 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 23.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2004 | Classification | IPC: | B05B1/20, A01M7/00 | [2004/26] | CPC: |
A01M7/0053 (EP,US);
A01M7/0071 (EP,US);
A01M7/0075 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/31] | B05B1/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | 11.04.2001 | LT | 11.04.2001 | LV | 11.04.2001 | MK | 11.04.2001 | RO | 11.04.2001 | SI | 11.04.2001 | Title | German: | SPRÜHBALKEN UND SPRÜHVERFAHREN | [2001/31] | English: | BOOM SPRAYER AND METHOD OF SPRAYING | [2001/31] | French: | PULVERISATEUR A RAMPE ET PROCEDE DE PULVERISATION ASSOCIE | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 07.12.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 04.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/49] | 16.07.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/49] | Request for further processing for: | 04.12.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2007 | 09   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2008 | 30.09.2008 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]DE2309718 (MARCEL BOSCHUNG SCHMITTEN FA); | [Y]EP0118366 (SEGUIP [FR]) | by applicant | US2965307 | US4784324 | EP0118366 | DE2309718 |