EP1113736 - FLUID DELIVERY TOOTHBRUSH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2004 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PROFESSIONAL DENTAL TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 633 Lawrence Street Batesville, AR 72501 / US | [2001/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SALE, David, William 124 Whispering Oakes Avenue Heber Springs, AR 72543 / US | 02 /
HAYNES, Ronald, W. P.O. Box 312 Shirley, AR 72153 / US | [2001/28] | Representative(s) | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al LARSEN & BIRKEHOLM A/S Skandinavisk Patentbureau Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2001/28] | Larsen, Hans Ole, et al Larsen & Birkeholm A/S, Banegaardspladsen 1, P.O. Box 362 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | Application number, filing date | 99948240.9 | 15.09.1999 | [2001/28] | WO1999US21206 | Priority number, date | US19980100361P | 15.09.1998 Original published format: US 100361 P | US19990328619 | 09.06.1999 Original published format: US 328619 | [2001/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0015076 | Date: | 23.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1113736 | Date: | 11.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1113736 | Date: | 05.11.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A46B11/00, A61C17/28 | [2001/28] | CPC: |
A61C17/227 (EP,US);
A46B11/002 (EP,US);
A61C17/28 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2003/45] |
Former [2001/28] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ZAHNBÜRSTE MIT FLÜSSIGKEITABGABESYSTEM | [2001/28] | English: | FLUID DELIVERY TOOTHBRUSH | [2001/28] | French: | BROSSE A DENTS A FLUIDE | [2001/28] | Entry into regional phase | 17.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 17.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 17.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/28] | 22.04.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.08.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.08.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 05.11.2003 | BE | 05.11.2003 | CH | 05.11.2003 | CY | 05.11.2003 | FI | 05.11.2003 | LI | 05.11.2003 | NL | 05.11.2003 | DK | 05.02.2004 | GR | 05.02.2004 | PT | 05.04.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
CY | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/52] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
BE | 05.11.2003 | ||
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
DK | 05.02.2004 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/33] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
CH | 05.11.2003 | ||
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
LI | 05.11.2003 | ||
NL | 05.11.2003 | ||
GR | 05.02.2004 | ||
Former [2004/31] | AT | 05.11.2003 | |
FI | 05.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/26] | FI | 05.11.2003 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US3235897 (FORTENBERRY JERRY A) [X] 1,2,11,12 * column 1, line 69 - column 4, line 71; figures 1-7 * [A] 3-10,13; | [A]US3447178 (PICKERING JOHN J) [A] 1,11 * column 2, line 41 - column 7, line 32; figures 1-11 *; | [XA]DE1632384 (BRAUN AG) [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 2, line 7 - line 19 * * page 2, line 27 - page 3, line 30; figures 1,2 * [A] 3-10,13; | [AD]US4315741 (REICHL ERNST) [AD] 1,11* column 2, line 63 - column 4, line 37; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4619009 (ROSENSTATTER OTTO [AT]) [A] 1,11 * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 62 * * column 8, line 40 - column 12, line 24; figures 1-12 * | by applicant | US4315741 | US5208933 | US5276935 | US5309590 | US5373599 | US5700146 |