EP1055053 - LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR HYDRAULIC PUMPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.05.2001 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.05.2001 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.06.2001 [2001/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PARKER-HANNIFIN CORPORATION 6035 Parkland Boulevard Cleveland, Ohio 44124-4141 / US | [2001/14] |
Former [2000/48] | For all designated states DANA CORPORATION 4500 Dorr Street, P.O. Box 1000 Toledo, OH 43697 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCBURNETT, James, Robert 513 Crestmont Way Greenville, SC 29615 / US | [2000/48] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/14] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2000/48] | Cheyne, John Robert Alexander Mackenzie Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99948470.2 | 28.09.1999 | [2000/48] | WO1999US22316 | Priority number, date | US19980161289 | 28.09.1998 Original published format: US 161289 | [2000/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0019067 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1055053 | Date: | 29.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.09.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.12.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F01M5/00, F16N13/20, F04C29/04 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
F16N13/20 (EP);
F01C21/02 (EP);
F04C15/0088 (EP);
F04C15/0096 (EP);
F04C2/18 (EP);
F16N39/02 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/51] | F01M5/00 | ||
Former IPC [2000/48] | F01M1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/48] | Title | German: | SCHMIERSYSTEM FÜR HYDRAULIKPUMPEN | [2000/48] | English: | LUBRICATION SYSTEM FOR HYDRAULIC PUMPS | [2000/48] | French: | SYSTEME DE GRAISSAGE POUR POMPES HYDRAULIQUES | [2000/48] | Entry into regional phase | 30.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 30.05.2000 | Search fee paid | 27.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/48] | 27.04.2001 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2001/26] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [Y]US3030529 (JAESCHKE RALPH L, et al); | [Y]US4470776 (KOSTEK THEODORE P [US], et al); | [Y]US5076770 (DABLING G ARLAN [US], et al) |