EP1084399 - METHOD FOR DETERMINING NOX CONCENTRATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.10.2002 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.11.2002 [2002/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hong Brandlbergerstrasse 138 D-93057 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
RÖSSLER, Jürgen Schwabenstrasse 10 D-93053 Regensburg / DE | [2001/12] | Application number, filing date | 99948567.5 | 09.04.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999DE01090 | Priority number, date | DE1998119581 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: DE 19819581 | [2001/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9957556 | Date: | 11.11.1999 | Language: | DE | [1999/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1084399 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084399 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | DE | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/419 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
G01N27/417 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2001/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER NOX-KONZENTRATION | [2001/12] | English: | METHOD FOR DETERMINING NOX CONCENTRATION | [2001/12] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LA DETERMINATION DE LA CONCENTRATION EN NOX | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2000 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 21.05.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.06.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.08.2001 | Fee for grant paid | 23.08.2001 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.09.2002 | No opposition filed within time limit [2002/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0816836 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 19, line 54 - column 20, line 12; figure 5 * * column 23, line 9 - line 43; figure 11 *; | [A]EP0769694 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * column 21, line 47 - column 22, line 54; figures 4A,4B *; | [A]EP0831322 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * figure 10 * | [X] - KATO NOBUHIDE ET AL, "Thick film ZrO2 NOx sensor for the measurement of low NOx concentration", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 SAE INTERNATIONAL CONGRESS & EXPOSITION;DETROIT, MI, USA FEB 23-26 1998, SAE Spec Publ;SAE Special Publications; Electronic Engine Controls 1998: Sensors, Actuators, and Development Tools Feb 1998 SAE, Warrendale, PA, USA, (199802), vol. 1356, pages 69 - 77, XP002118676 [X] 1 * page 74 - page 76; figure 10 * |