EP1044416 - AUTOMATIC INQUIRY METHOD AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.08.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scansoft, Inc. 9 Centennial Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | [2003/29] |
Former [2000/42] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAASSEN, Antonius, M., W. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/42] | Representative(s) | Alton, Andrew, et al Murgitroyd & Company Leeds Arena Point Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2004/48] | Alton, Andrew, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Tower North Central Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2003/19] | Atkinson, Jonathan David Mark, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Tower House Merrion Way Leeds LS2 8PA / GB | ||
Former [2002/45] | Volmer, Georg, Dipl.-Ing., et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Weisshausstrasse 2 52066 Aachen / DE | ||
Former [2000/42] | Gössmann, Klemens Philips Corporate Intellectual Property GmbH, Habsburgerallee 11 52064 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 99948825.7 | 22.09.1999 | [2000/42] | WO1999EP07032 | Priority number, date | EP19980203423 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: EP 98203423 | [2000/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0022549 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1044416 | Date: | 18.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30 | [2000/42] | CPC: |
G06F16/3329 (EP,US);
G06F16/24522 (EP,US);
G10L15/1815 (EP,US);
G10L15/22 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2000/42] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES AUSKUNFTSVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2000/42] | English: | AUTOMATIC INQUIRY METHOD AND SYSTEM | [2000/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET SYSTEME D'INTERROGATION AUTOMATIQUE | [2000/42] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/51] | 26.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/39] | 10.05.2006 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2003 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   31.03.2004 | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   03.03.2005 | 30.09.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X] - CHANGWEN YANG ET AL, "Development of the INRS ATIS system", PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1993 INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOP ON INTELLIGENT USER INTERFACES, ORLANDO, FL, USA, 4-7 JAN. 1993, 1992, Baltimore, MD, USA, ACM, USA, ISBN 0-89791-556-9, pages 133 - 140, XP000884162 [X] 1-12 * abstract * * page 135, column 1, line 27 - page 135, column 2, line 3 * * paragraph [CONCLUSION] * | [A] - DYBKJAER L ET AL, "A methodology for diagnostic evaluation of spoken human-machine dialogue", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF HUMAN-COMPUTER STUDIES, MAY 1998, ACADEMIC PRESS, UK, vol. 48, no. 5, ISSN 1071-5819, pages 605 - 625, XP000884159 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/ijhc.1997.0183 | [A] - BOYCE S J, "Designing the user interface for a natural spoken dialogue system", DESIGN OF COMPUTING SYSTEMS: COGNITIVE CONSIDERATIONS. PROCEEDINGS OF THE SEVENTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMAN-COMPUTER INTERACTION (HCI INTERNATIONAL '97), PROCEEDINGS OF HCI INTERNATIONAL 97. 7TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON HUMAN COMPUTER INTE, 1997, Amsterdam, Netherlands, Elsevier, Netherlands, ISBN 0-444-82183-X, pages 367 - 370 vol.2, XP000884148 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * | [A] - FELDES S ET AL, "A design environment for acoustic interfaces to databases", PROCEEDINGS 1998 IEEE 4TH WORKSHOP INTERACTIVE VOICE TECHNOLOGY FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS APPLICATIONS. IVTTA '98 (CAT. NO.98TH8376), PROCEEDINGS OF IVTTA'98. 4TH IEEE WORKSHOP ON INTERACTIVE VOICE TECHNOLOGY FOR TELECOMMUNICATIONS APPLICATIONS, TORINO,, 1998, New York, NY, USA, IEEE, USA, ISBN 0-7803-5028-6, pages 103 - 106, XP000884018 [A] 1-12 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/IVTTA.1998.727702 |