EP1117437 - USE OF COMPOUNDS THAT REDUCE ALPHA2-ANTIPLASMIN IN VIVO FOR THE PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIC STROKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2007 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Leuven Research & Development vzw Benedenstraat 60 B-3000 Leuven / BE | [2006/52] |
Former [2004/21] | For all designated states Leuven Research & Development VZW Benedenstraat 60 B-3000 Leuven / BE | ||
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states K.U. Leuven Research & Development Groot Begijnhof, Benedenstraat 60 3000 Leuven / BE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAGAI, Nobuo E-317, Handa-cho 3776 Hamamatsu, Shizuoka 431-3124 / JP | 02 /
COLLEN, Désiré, José 28 Collingham Gardens London SW5 0HN / GB | [2001/30] | Representative(s) | van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Sweelinkplein 1 2517 GK The Hague / NL | ||
Former [2001/30] | Van Someren, Petronella F. H. M., et al Arnold & Siedsma, Advocaten en Octrooigemachtigden, Sweelinckplein 1 2517 GK Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 99948942.0 | 24.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999EP07405 | Priority number, date | EP19980203280 | 29.09.1998 Original published format: EP 98203280 | EP19990202004 | 22.06.1999 Original published format: EP 99202004 | [2001/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0018436 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117437 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1117437 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/395, A61K38/48, A61P9/10 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
A61K38/484 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07K16/38 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/30] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN DIE ALPHA2-ANTIPLASMIN IN VIVO REDUZIEREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG ISCHÄMISCHER SCHLAGANFÄLLE | [2001/30] | English: | USE OF COMPOUNDS THAT REDUCE ALPHA2-ANTIPLASMIN IN VIVO FOR THE PREPARATION OF A COMPOSITION FOR THE TREATMENT OF ISCHEMIC STROKE | [2001/30] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMPOSES DE REDUCTION DES $g(a) 2?-ANTIPLASMINES IN-VIVO POUR LA PREPARATION D'UNE COMPOSITION THERAPEUTIQUE CONTRE L'ACCIDENT ISCHEMIQUE CEREBRAL | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 18.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.09.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2006 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 10.04.2006 | 07.04.2006 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 10.04.2006 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.05.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.06.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 22.06.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.12.2006 | CY | 27.12.2006 | NL | 27.12.2006 | GR | 28.03.2007 | PT | 28.05.2007 | LU | 24.09.2007 | [2010/06] |
Former [2008/21] | AT | 27.12.2006 | |
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
GR | 28.03.2007 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 27.12.2006 | |
NL | 27.12.2006 | ||
PT | 28.05.2007 | ||
Former [2007/31] | AT | 27.12.2006 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0631786 (IMMUNO AG [AT]) [X] 6 * claim - *; | [X]WO9812329 (REED GUY L [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 23, line 25 - page 24, line 9 * * examples 1,2 * * claim - *; | [A] - A. BUTTE ET AL., "Alpha2-antiplasmin causes thrombi to resist fibrinolysis induced by tissue plasminogen activator in experimental pulmonary embolism.", CIRCULATION, New York, NY, USA, (19970401), vol. 95, no. 7, pages 1886 - 1891, XP002062707 [A] 1-5 * the whole document * | [A] - G. REED, "Functional characterization of monoclonal antibody inhibitors of alpha2-antiplasmin that accelerate fibrinolysis in different animal plasmas.", HYBRIDOMA, New York, NY, USA, (199706), vol. 16, no. 3, pages 281 - 286, XP002062706 [A] 1-5 * abstract * | [PX] - N. NAGAI ET AL., "Role of plasminogen system components in focal cerebral ischemic infarction: a gene targeting and gene transfer study in mice.", CIRCULATION, New York, NY, USA, (19990511), vol. 99, no. 18, pages 2440 - 2444, XP002112003 [PX] 1-5 * the whole document * |