EP1121361 - PYRAZOLO-TRIAZINE DERIVATIVES AS LIGANDS FOR GABA RECEPTORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.07.2008 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.01.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, LU State(s) deleted from list of lapses: FR | published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon, Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | [2007/35] |
Former [2001/32] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CARLING, William Robert Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 02 /
MITCHINSON, Andrew Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 03 /
MOORE, Kevin William Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 04 /
RUSSELL, Michael Geoffrey Neil Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 05 /
SCOTT, Gayle Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | 06 /
STREET, Leslie Joseph Terlings Park, Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 120 Moorgate London, EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/49] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited, Hertford Road, Hoddesdon Hertfordshire, EN11 9BU / GB | ||
Former [2004/27] | Horgan, James Michael Frederic, et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | ||
Former [2001/32] | Thompson, John Dr., et al Merck & Co., Inc. European Patent Department Terlings Park Eastwick Road Harlow, Essex CM20 2QR / GB | Application number, filing date | 99949224.2 | 13.10.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999GB03401 | Priority number, date | GB19980022716 | 16.10.1998 Original published format: GB 9822716 | GB19990020092 | 25.08.1999 Original published format: GB 9920092 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023449 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121361 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121361 | Date: | 29.08.2007 | Language: | EN | [2007/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61K31/53 | [2007/18] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/32] | C07D487/04, A61K31/53, // (C07D487/04, 231:00), C07D253:00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Extension states | AL | 16.05.2001 | LT | 16.05.2001 | LV | 16.05.2001 | MK | 16.05.2001 | RO | 16.05.2001 | SI | 16.05.2001 | Title | German: | PYRAZOLOTRIAZINDERIVATE ALS GABA-REZEPTORLIGANDEN | [2001/32] | English: | PYRAZOLO-TRIAZINE DERIVATIVES AS LIGANDS FOR GABA RECEPTORS | [2001/32] | French: | DERIVES PYRAZOLO-TRIAZINE UTILISES EN TANT QUE LIGANDS DES RECEPTEURS GABA | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 13.10.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.02.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.03.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.05.2008 | No opposition filed within time limit [2008/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 29.08.2007 | BE | 29.08.2007 | CY | 29.08.2007 | DK | 29.08.2007 | FI | 29.08.2007 | NL | 29.08.2007 | LU | 13.10.2007 | IE | 15.10.2007 | MC | 31.10.2007 | SE | 29.11.2007 | GR | 30.11.2007 | PT | 29.01.2008 | [2009/38] |
Former [2009/30] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
FR | 31.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
IE | 15.10.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
SE | 29.11.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/26] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
MC | 31.10.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
PT | 29.01.2008 | ||
Former [2008/23] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
DK | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
BE | 29.08.2007 | ||
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | ||
GR | 30.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 29.08.2007 | |
FI | 29.08.2007 | ||
NL | 29.08.2007 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO9510521 (BOOTS CO PLC [GB], et al) [Y] 1-11* claims 1-19 *; | [A]WO9804560 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [A] 1-11 * claims 1-10 *; | [Y]WO9804559 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [Y] 1-11 * claims 1-23 *; | [PY]WO9900391 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [PY] 1-11 * claims 1-12 *; | [PY]WO9936423 (MERCK SHARP & DOHME [GB], et al) [PY] 1-11 * claims 1-12 * |