EP1046936 - OPTICAL MULTIPLEXER/DEMULTIPLEXER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 15.12.2006 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.12.2006 | Withdrawal of application | published on 17.01.2007 [2007/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO., LTD. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states The Furukawa Electric Co., Ltd. 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAMURA, Shiro 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 02 /
NAKAJIMA, Takeshi 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | 03 /
TANAKA, Kanji 6-1, Marunouchi 2-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8322 / JP | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Tappe, Hartmut advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Tappe, Hartmut Patentanwälte, Böck + Tappe Kollegen, Kantstrasse 40 97074 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 99949423.0 | 26.10.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999JP05908 | Priority number, date | JP19980315828 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: JP 31582898 | [2000/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0028357 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046936 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.05.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G02B6/12014 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/21] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | OPTISCHER MULTIPLEXER/DEMULTIPLEXER | [2000/43] | English: | OPTICAL MULTIPLEXER/DEMULTIPLEXER | [2000/43] | French: | MULTIPLEXEUR/DEMULTIPLEXEUR OPTIQUE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2000 | Translation filed | 10.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Search fee paid | 10.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 13.12.2006 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2007/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9813718 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1 * page 2, lines 6-31 * * page 4, lines 1-12 * * page 5, paragraph 3 * * page 13, lines 1-5 * * page 13, lines 30-34 * * page 26, paragraph 2; figures 1,10; claims 1,14 * | International search | [A]JPH0949936 (HITACHI CABLE); | [A]JPH0763934 (NIPPON TELEGRAPH & TELEPHONE) |