EP1163189 - SYNTHESIS OF THE CUBIC MESOPOROUS MOLECULAR SIEVE MCM-48 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROTH, Wieslaw, Jerzy 123 Bound Brook Sewell, NJ 08080 / US | [2001/51] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/51] | Dew, Melvyn John ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99949667.2 | 23.09.1999 | [2001/51] | WO1999US21239 | Priority number, date | US19980169801 | 12.10.1998 Original published format: US 169801 | [2001/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0021882 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1163189 | Date: | 19.12.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C01B33/12, C01B33/36 | [2001/51] | CPC: |
C01B37/02 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/51] | Title | German: | SYNTHESE DES MESOPORÖSEN, KUBISCHEN MOLEKULARSIEBES MCM-48 | [2001/51] | English: | SYNTHESIS OF THE CUBIC MESOPOROUS MOLECULAR SIEVE MCM-48 | [2001/51] | French: | SYNTHESE DE CRIBLE MOLECULAIRE MESOPOREUX CUBIQUE MCM-48 | [2001/51] | Entry into regional phase | 11.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.09.2001 | Search fee paid | 11.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 11.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/51] | 31.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 05.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.09.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 05.09.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5300277 (KRESGE CHARLES T [US], et al); | [Y]US5250282 (KRESGE CHARLES T [US], et al); | [A]US5238676 (ROTH WIESLAW J [US], et al) |