EP1152895 - HIGH BARRIER MULTI-LAYER FILM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.02.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.02.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.04.2005 [2005/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ExxonMobil Oil Corporation 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | For all designated states EXXONMOBIL OIL CORPORATION 3225 Gallows Road Fairfax, VA 22037-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SU, Tein-Kuei 4 Monarch Drive Fairport, NY 14450 / US | 02 /
CHU, Shaw-Chang 3 Wynwood Drive Princeton Junction, NJ 08550 / US | 03 /
KEUNG, Jay, K. 579 Fox Hunt Drive Victor, NY 14564 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. IP Law Europe Hermeslaan 2 1831 Machelen / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/46] | Dew, Melvyn John, et al ExxonMobil Chemical Europe Inc. Law Technology P.O.Box 105 1830 Machelen / BE | Application number, filing date | 99949716.7 | 17.09.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999US21503 | Priority number, date | US19980157767 | 21.09.1998 Original published format: US 157767 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0016977 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1152895 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.03.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2001 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B29C55/12, B65D65/40 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B2307/518 (US);
B32B2307/7244 (US);
B32B2307/7246 (US);
B32B2323/10 (US);
B32B2391/00 (US);
B32B2439/70 (US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | B32B27/32 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGER HOCHSPERRENDER FILM | [2001/46] | English: | HIGH BARRIER MULTI-LAYER FILM | [2001/46] | French: | FILM MULTICOUCHE HAUTEMENT BARRIERE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 19.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 19.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 19.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 31.07.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.05.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.09.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/14] | 02.11.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0444340 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [X] 1,2,5,8-10 * page 2, column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 32 * * example 1; claims 1,2,7-11 *; | [X]WO9627491 (QUANTUM CHEM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,9,10 * page 2, line 31 - page 3, line 23 * * page 5, line 5 - page 7, line 17 * * page 8, line 4 - page 9, line 6 * * claims 1-8,20-27,37-42 *; | [A]EP0713766 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) [A] 1,5-7,9 * page 2, line 50 - page 3, line 10 * * page 4, line 57 - page 5, line 5 * * page 6, line 24 - line 44 *; | [A]WO9804403 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 4, line 1 - page 6, line 6 * * page 7, line 22 - line 26 * * example 1 * | International search | [A]US5155160 (YEH GENE H [US], et al); | [A]US5141801 (TAKESHITA KENNETH [US], et al); | [A]US5302327 (CHU SHAW-CHANG [US], et al); | [A]US5759648 (IDLAS SCOTT ALLAN [US]); | [A]US4590125 (BALLONI RICCARDO [US], et al) |