EP1115614 - FLUID DAMPER INCLUDING FLEXIBLE DAMPING PLATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.04.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.06.2004 [2004/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LORD Corporation 111 Lord Drive Cary, NC 27511 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | For all designated states LORD CORPORATION 111 Lord Drive, P.O. Box 8012 Cary, NC 27512-8012 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JONES, Peter, J. 5510 Herman Drive Erie, PA 16509-1843 / US | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James LLP Essex Place 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/29] | Dunlop, Brian Kenneth Charles, et al c/o Wynne-Jones, Lainé & James 22 Rodney Road Cheltenham Gloucestershire GL50 1JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99949813.2 | 23.09.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999US22085 | Priority number, date | US19980159293 | 23.09.1998 Original published format: US 159293 | [2001/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0017047 | Date: | 30.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1115614 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1115614 | Date: | 25.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B64C27/35, F16F13/10 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
B64C27/51 (EP,US);
F16F13/105 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/26] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | FLÜSSIGKEITSGEFÜLLTER DÄMPFER MIT EINER FLEXIBLEN DÄMPFUNGSPLATTE | [2001/29] | English: | FLUID DAMPER INCLUDING FLEXIBLE DAMPING PLATE | [2001/29] | French: | AMORTISSEUR FLUIDIQUE COMPORTANT UNE PLAQUE AMORTISSEUSE FLEXIBLE | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 09.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 23.12.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]US5540549 (MCGUIRE DENNIS P [US]) [DA] 1,19-22 * figure 1 * * abstract *; | [A]EP0636810 (HUTCHINSON [FR]) [A] 1,19-22 * column 2, line 18 - column 4, line 11 *; | [A]GB2310025 (KOMATSU MFG CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1,19-22 * figures 5,6 *; | [DA]US4790521 (IDE TAKANOBU [JP], et al); | [A]US5263815 (BRENNER HEINRICH [DE]) | by applicant | US4778343 | US5092738 | US4893988 | US3758230 | US5374039 | US4566677 | US3874646 | US3154273 | US3141523 | US4790521 | US4779585 | US4770396 | US5540549 |