EP1121416 - ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS FOR CONTROL OF TEMPERATURE DURING THE PROCESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.04.2004 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 02.12.2009 [2009/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Genetronics, Inc. 11199-A Sorrento Valley Road San Diego, CA 92121 / US | [2001/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NANDA, Gurvinder, Singh Apt 53, 10248 Maya Limda Road San Diego, CA 92126 / US | 02 /
LAVERDIERE, Rejean 3928 Arverne Street San Diego, CA 92111-3308 / US | 03 /
HOFMANN, Gunter, A. 3750 Riviera Drive 6 San Diego, CA 92109 / US | [2001/32] | Representative(s) | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | ||
Former [2001/32] | Gates, Marie Christina Esther, et al c/o Tomkins & Co. 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6 / IE | Application number, filing date | 99949889.2 | 27.09.1999 | [2001/32] | WO1999US22306 | Priority number, date | US19980176136 | 21.10.1998 Original published format: US 176136 | [2001/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0023563 | Date: | 27.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1121416 | Date: | 08.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1121416 | Date: | 04.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12M3/00, C12N15/87 | [2001/32] | CPC: |
C12M35/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ELEKTROPORATION BEI DER DIE TEMPERATUR WÄHREND DIESES PROZESSES KONTROLLIERT WIRD | [2001/32] | English: | ELECTROPORATION APPARATUS FOR CONTROL OF TEMPERATURE DURING THE PROCESS | [2001/32] | French: | APPAREIL D'ELECTROPORATION DESTINE AU CONTROLE DE LA TEMPERATURE AU COURS DU PROCESSUS | [2001/32] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/32] | 30.10.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 04.06.2003 | FI | 04.06.2003 | DK | 04.09.2003 | GR | 04.09.2003 | PT | 04.09.2003 | SE | 04.09.2003 | ES | 15.09.2003 | CY | 27.09.2003 | [2004/36] |
Former [2004/29] | BE | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
DK | 04.09.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/28] | BE | 04.06.2003 | |
FI | 04.06.2003 | ||
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | FI | 04.06.2003 | |
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
SE | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | FI | 04.06.2003 | |
GR | 04.09.2003 | ||
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | GR | 04.09.2003 | |
PT | 04.09.2003 | ||
ES | 15.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5019034 (WEAVER JAMES C [US], et al) [A] * the whole document *; | [DA]US5185071 (SERWER PHILIP [US], et al) [DA] * the whole document *; | [DA]WO9612006 (GENETRONICS INC [US]) [DA] * the whole document *; | [A]WO9810515 (GENETRONICS INC [US]) [A] * the whole document *; | [A] - NELSON R J ET AL, "USE OF PELTIER THERMOELECTRIC DEVICES TO CONTROL COLUMN TEMPERATURE IN HIGH-PERFORMANCE CAPILLARY ELECTROPHORESIS", JOURNAL OF CHROMATOGRAPHY,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM, (19891020), vol. 480, ISSN 0021-9673, pages 111 - 127, XP000608535 [A] * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0021-9673(01)84282-5 |