EP1129277 - INSULATIVE SHIELD, PARTICULARLY FOR AUTOMOTIVE EXHAUST COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.05.2005 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.07.2005 [2005/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NU-CHEM, INC. 2200 Cassens Drive Fenton, MO 63026 / US | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FELDMAN, Rubin 28 Somerset Downs Ladue, MO 63124 / US | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A., P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 99949953.6 | 29.09.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999US22496 | Priority number, date | US19980169915 | 12.10.1998 Original published format: US 169915 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0022285 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129277 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 20.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01N7/14, F01N7/10, F01N3/28 | [2002/03] | CPC: |
F01N13/14 (EP,US);
B01D53/94 (EP,US);
F01N3/28 (EP,US);
F01N2310/14 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP);
Y10T442/2049 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2001/36] | F01N3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ISOLATIONSSCHILD, INSBESONDERE FÜR FAHRZEUG-ABGASSYSTEME | [2001/36] | English: | INSULATIVE SHIELD, PARTICULARLY FOR AUTOMOTIVE EXHAUST COMPONENTS | [2001/36] | French: | ECRAN ISOLANT, NOTAMMENT POUR COMPOSANTS DE SYSTEME D'ECHAPPEMENT D'AUTOMOBILE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 23.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 23.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 18.03.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.01.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/28] | 16.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2005/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.08.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE4137706 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-6,12-14,16,20,29-32 * column 2, line 46 - line 63; figure 2 * * column 1, line 36 - line 68 * [Y] 7,11,17-19,21-23,26,27; | [XY]US4617072 (MERZ HERBERT [DE]) [X] 24,25 * column 4, line 18 - line 26; claim 10 * * column 6, line 56 - column 7, line 2; figure 5A * [Y] 7,11,17,23; | [Y]EP0455061 (LYDALL INC [US]) [Y] 18,19,21,22,26,27 * page 4, line 20 - line 29 *; | [A]EP0340946 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 24,25 * column 4, line 3 - line 11 *; | [A]EP0446813 (SUZUKI CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,12,16,20,26,29 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US5004018 (BAINBRIDGE DAVID W [US]); | [A]US4168610 (ENGQUIST KARL R); | [A]US4617072 (MERZ HERBERT [DE]); | [A]US4487289 (KICINSKI KENNETH J [US], et al); | [A]US3863445 (HEATH ROBERT A) | by applicant | US5477676 | US5419127 | US5390494 | US5163289 | US5385790 | US5590524 | US5387455 | US5451448 | US5360500 | US5108810 | US5480697 | US5240533 | US5166480 | US4687785 | US4508776 | US4251928 | US5157893 | US5175975 | US5792539 | US5603297 |