EP1153465 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING AND MAINTAINING A PLURALITY OF BATTERIES USING A FUZZY LOGIC [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALLIEDSIGNAL ENVIRONMENTAL CATALYSTS 101 Colombia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [2001/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIO, Stephen, T. 25 Kingsbrook Court Mendham, NJ 07945 / US | 02 /
PALANISAMY, Thirumalai, G. 14 Canterbury Way Morristown, NJ 07960 / US | 03 /
SINGH, Harmohan 35 Sherbrook Drive Rockaway, NJ 07866 / US | 04 /
TEGGE, Rainer 6 Thoresen Road Warren, NJ 07059 / US | [2001/46] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/42] | Buckley, Guy Julian, et al Patent Outsourcing Limited Cornerhourse 1 King Street Bakewell Derbyshire DE45 1EW / GB | ||
Former [2001/46] | Haley, Stephen, et al Gill Jennings & Every, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 99950117.4 | 01.10.1999 | [2001/46] | WO1999US22962 | Priority number, date | US19980102629P | 01.10.1998 Original published format: US 102629 P | US19990408675 | 30.09.1999 Original published format: US 408675 | [2001/46] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019578 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1153465 | Date: | 14.11.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.07.2004 | Classification | IPC: | H02J7/00, G01R31/36 | [2004/37] | CPC: |
G01R31/367 (EP,US);
H02J7/0013 (EP,US);
G01R31/374 (EP,US);
G01R31/379 (EP,US);
G01R31/3842 (EP,US);
G01R31/396 (EP,US);
H02J7/0014 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2001/46] | H02J7/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG UND WARTUNG VON MEHREREN BATTERIEN UNTER ANWENDUNG VON FUZZY-LOGIK | [2001/46] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MONITORING AND MAINTAINING A PLURALITY OF BATTERIES USING A FUZZY LOGIC | [2001/46] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT LE CONTROLE ET L'ENTRETIEN D'UNE PLURALITE DE BATTERIES AU MOYEN D'UNE LOGIQUE FLOUE | [2001/46] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2001 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 29.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/46] | 10.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.08.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 07.10.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 07.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 23.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 10.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 05.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 07.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 15 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 08.06.2001 | M01   Fee paid on   29.06.2001 | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 16   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]US5281919 (PALANISAMY THIRUMALAI G [US]); | [A]US5321627 (REHER MICHAEL T [US]); | [A]US5578915 (CROUCH JR DELL A [US], et al); | [A]US5592094 (ICHIKAWA HIROSHI [JP]); | [A]US5650712 (KAWAI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [A]US5652502 (VAN PHUOC DUONG [DE], et al); | [Y]US5710503 (SIDERIS ANTONIOS G [US], et al); | [Y]US5808445 (AYLOR JAMES H [US], et al); | [AP]US5864237 (KAWAI TOSHIYUKI [JP], et al); | [AP]US5883496 (ESAKI KENJI [JP], et al); | [AP]US5886499 (HALL JOHN C [US]); | [AP]US5929594 (NONOBE YASUHIRO [JP], et al); | [AP]US5945808 (KIKUCHI TOSHIO [JP], et al); | [YP]US5955869 (RATHMANN ROLAND [DE]) |