EP1119543 - N-ARALKYLAMINOTETRALINS AS LIGANDS FOR THE NEUROPEPTIDE Y Y5 RECEPTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.10.2005 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.10.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.12.2005 [2005/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route No. 202, P.O. Box 300 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | For all designated states Ortho-McNeil Pharmaceutical, Inc. U.S. Route No.202, P.O. Box 300 Raritan, NJ 08869-0602 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DAX, Scott, L. 3 Quail Drive Landenberg, PA 19350 / US | 02 /
LOVENBERG, Timothy, W. 13252 Courtland Terrace San Diego, CA 92130 / US | 03 /
BAXTER, Ellen, W. 148 North Keswick Avenue Glenside, PA 19038 / US | 04 /
CARSON, John, R. 551 Rittenhouse Boulevard Norristown, PA 19403 / US | 05 /
LUDOVICI, Donald, W. 1390 Masi Road Quakertown, PA 18951 / US | 06 /
YOUNGMAN, Mark, A. 675 E. Street Road Warminster, PA 18974 / US | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | Mercer, Christopher Paul, et al Carpmaels & Ransford 43, Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99950218.0 | 06.10.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999US23259 | Priority number, date | US19980103446P | 07.10.1998 Original published format: US 103446 P | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020376 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119543 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1119543 | Date: | 15.12.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/58, C07C217/74, C07D209/58, A61K31/135, A61K31/40 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C07C217/74 (EP,US);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P15/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P25/06 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/20 (EP);
A61P25/22 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07C217/58 (EP,US);
C07D209/16 (EP,US);
C07D213/38 (EP,US);
C07B2200/07 (EP,US);
C07C2602/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/31] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | N-ARALKYLAMINOTETRALINE ALS NEUROPEPTID-Y-Y5-REZEPTORLIGANDEN | [2001/31] | English: | N-ARALKYLAMINOTETRALINS AS LIGANDS FOR THE NEUROPEPTIDE Y Y5 RECEPTOR | [2001/31] | French: | N-ARALKYLAMINOTETRALINES UTILISEES COMME LIGANDS DU RECEPTEUR DU NEUROPEPTIDE Y Y5 | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 27.04.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 06.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.06.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.10.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 12.10.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0064964 (ASTRA LAEKEMEDEL AB [SE]) [X] 1-5,15,16 * see page 4: 4rth compound of the table *; | [X]EP0334538 (UPJOHN CO [US]) [X] 1-5,15,16 * examples 3,6 *; | [DA]WO9720822 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1* the whole document *; | [X] - A.M.JOHANSSON ET AL., "Resolved cis- and trans-2-Amino-5-methoxy-1-methyltetralins", J. MED. CHEM., (1987), vol. 30, no. 4, pages 602 - 611, XP002128861 [X] 1-5,15,16 * see scheme I: compound 3 see scheme II: compounds 12,13,16,17,20,21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00387a004 | [X] - C.-H. LIN ET AL., "Centrally Acting serotonergic Agents", J. MED. CHEM., (1993), vol. 36, no. 6, pages 671 - 682, XP002128862 [X] 1-5,15,16 * tables I,II * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00058a003 | [X] - A.M. JOHANSSON ET AL., "Novel Dopamine Receptor Agonosts ...", J. MED. CHEM., (1985), vol. 28, no. 8, pages 1049 - 1053, XP002128863 [X] 1-5,15,16 * see page 1050: compound 6 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00146a012 | [X] - BEILSTEIN INFORMATION SERVICE FILE: XFIRE, XP002128864 [X] 1-5 * see attached compounds (RNs , BRNs) * | [X] - STN INFORMATION SERVICE FILE: REGISTRY, XP002128865 [X] 1-5 * see RNs together with markers * | [X] - BEILSTEIN INFORMATION SERVICE FILE: XFIRE, XP002128866 [X] 6 * see attached compounds (Rns, BRNs) * |