EP1086035 - METHOD FOR CONVEYING ON HIGH-DENSITY BED POWDER MATERIALS AND DEVICE WITH POTENTIAL FLUIDISATION FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2003 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.09.2003 [2003/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALUMINIUM PECHINEY 7, Place du Chancelier Adenauer 75218 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [2001/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GASQUET, Gérard 49, rue du Bergeret F-13170 Les Pennes Mirabeau / FR | 02 /
CLOUE, Christian Villa Alu no2 Quartier Bompertuis F-13120 Gardanne / FR | [2001/13] | Representative(s) | Marsolais, Richard Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217 Cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/13] | Marsolais, Richard Péchiney, Immeuble "SIS" 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99950340.2 | 06.05.1999 | [2001/13] | WO1999FR01075 | Priority number, date | FR19980006124 | 11.05.1998 Original published format: FR 9806124 | [2001/13] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9958435 | Date: | 18.11.1999 | Language: | FR | [1999/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1086035 | Date: | 28.03.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1086035 | Date: | 25.09.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | B65G53/16, B65G53/20, C25C3/14 | [2001/13] | CPC: |
B65G53/16 (EP,US);
B65G53/20 (EP,US);
C25C3/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, NL, SE [2001/13] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM FÖRDERN PULVERFÖRMIGEN MATERIALS IN HOCH-DICHTEN FLIESSBETT, SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS MIT POTENTIELLER FLUIDISIERUNG | [2001/27] | English: | METHOD FOR CONVEYING ON HIGH-DENSITY BED POWDER MATERIALS AND DEVICE WITH POTENTIAL FLUIDISATION FOR IMPLEMENTING SAME | [2001/13] | French: | PROCEDE POUR LE CONVOYAGE EN LIT HYPERDENSE DE MATERIAUX PULVERULENTS ET DISPOSITIF A FLUIDISATION POTENTIELLE DESTINE A LE METTRE EN OEUVRE | [2001/13] |
Former [2001/13] | VERFAHREN ZUM FÖRDERN PULVERFÖRMIGEN MATERIALS DES NOCH-DICHTEN FLIESSBETT, SOWIE VORRICHTUNG ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG DES VERFAHRENS MIT BEGRENZTER FLUIDIERUNG | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.09.2000 | Examination requested [2001/13] | 28.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.04.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.06.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3056632 (WALTER ISLER) [A] 1,9,12 * column W *; | [DA]US4016053 (STANKOVICH IVAN D, et al) [DA] 1,9,12 * column W *; | [A]EP0026735 (ALUSUISSE [CH]) [A] 1,9,12* the whole document *; | [A]DE3024567 (COBOLT CARL COMPART [DE]) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document *; | [A]WO8504676 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM [FR]) [A] 1,9,12 * the whole document *; | [D]EP0179055 (PECHINEY ALUMINIUM) [D] 1,9,12 | by applicant | US4016053 | EP0179055 |