Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4399117B | Global Dossier | 13.01.2010 | B2 | JP2002531324 | 24.09.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | DE9902369 | 31.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1053144 | Global Dossier | 27.07.2005 | B1 | EP1053144 | 22.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | DE9902369 | 31.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59912333D1 | 01.09.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | DE9902369 | 31.07.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6427282 | 06.08.2002 | B1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | DE9902369 | 31.07.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0034089 | Global Dossier | 15.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100622839B | Global Dossier | 12.09.2006 | B1 | KR20010040655 | 15.05.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE19856279 | 08.06.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2244219T | 01.12.2005 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE19856279 | 07.12.1998 |