EP1053144 - WIPER BLADE FOR AUTOMOBILE GLASS PANELS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.2006 [2006/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2000/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOTLARSKI, Thomas Westerwaldstrasse 16 D-53474 Bad Neuenahr / DE | [2000/47] | Application number, filing date | 99950486.3 | 31.07.1999 | [2000/47] | WO1999DE02369 | Priority number, date | DE1998156279 | 07.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19856279 | [2000/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0034089 | Date: | 15.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1053144 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1053144 | Date: | 27.07.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B60S1/38, B60S1/40 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
B60S1/3858 (EP,US);
B60S1/38 (EP,KR,US);
B60S1/4006 (EP,US);
B60S1/3855 (EP,US);
B60S1/3867 (EP,US);
B60S2001/382 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49622 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2000/47] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | WISCHBLATT FÜR SCHEIBEN VON KRAFTFAHRZEUGEN | [2000/47] | English: | WIPER BLADE FOR AUTOMOBILE GLASS PANELS | [2000/47] | French: | RACLETTE D'ESSUIE-GLACE POUR DES VITRES DE VEHICULES AUTOMOBILES | [2000/47] | Entry into regional phase | 07.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 16.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.01.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.05.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 30.05.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.07.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3317945 (LUDWIG ARTHUR L) [A] 1 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 62; figures 5-10 *; | [A]DE2713384 (TRICO FOLBERTH LTD) [A] 1 * page 6, line 1 - page 7, line 24; figure 11 *; | [A]DE2843164 (AGUIARI OFER [IT], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, paragraph 5 - page 4, paragraph 7; figure - *; | [PA]DE19729865 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PA] 1* column 3, line 37 - column 4, line 12; figures 1,5 * | by applicant | DE1247161 | DE2614457 |