EP1228056 - METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF CITALOPRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.07.2005 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.09.2005 [2005/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states H. Lundbeck A/S 9, Ottiliavej 2500 Copenhagen / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | For all designated states H. LUNDBECK A/S 9, Ottiliavej 2500 Copenhagen / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ROCK, Michael, Harold Risbjergvej 28 DK-2650 Hvidovre / DK | 02 /
PETERSEN, Hans Guldagervej 11 DK-2720 Vanl se / DK | 03 /
ELLEGAARD, Peter Knud Lavardsvej 98 DK-4174 Jystrup / DK | [2002/32] | Representative(s) | Meidahl Petersen, John, et al c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Patent Department Ottiliavej 7-9 2500 Copenhagen-Valby / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2002/32] | Meidahl Petersen, John, et al c/o H. Lundbeck A/S Patent Department Ottiliavej 7-9 2500 Copenhagen-Valby / DK | Application number, filing date | 99950511.8 | 25.10.1999 | [2002/32] | WO1999DK00581 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO0012044 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1228056 | Date: | 07.08.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1228056 | Date: | 22.09.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 03.08.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/87, C07C253/30, C07C255/56, A61K31/343, A61P25/24 | [2002/32] | CPC: |
C07D307/87 (EP,US);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/32] | Extension states | AL | 27.05.2002 | LT | 27.05.2002 | LV | 27.05.2002 | MK | 27.05.2002 | RO | 27.05.2002 | SI | 27.05.2002 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CITALOPRAM | [2002/32] | English: | METHOD FOR THE PREPARATION OF CITALOPRAM | [2002/32] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION DE CITALOPRAME | [2002/32] | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.06.2001 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 27.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/32] | 29.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.07.2002 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 29.11.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.04.2003 | Date of oral proceedings | 15.04.2003 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.05.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP02028326.3 / EP1298124 | Opposition(s) | 23.06.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4650884 (BOGESO KLAUS P [DK]); | [X]US4943590 (BOEGESOE KLAUS P [DK], et al); | [X]WO9819511 (LUNDBECK & CO AS H [DK], et al) |