EP1119572 - PHOTOCHROMATIC COMPOUNDS, PREPARATION, USE IN POLYMERIC MATERIALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.04.2003 Database last updated on 24.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Great Lakes Chemical (Europe) GmbH Bahnhofplatz 65 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [2001/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALATESTA, Vincenzo Via Repubblica, 21 I-20090 San Maurizio al Lambro / IT | 02 /
SALEMI-DELVAUX, Christiane 104, avenue des Goumiers F-13008 Marseille / FR | 03 /
DENIEL, Marie-Hélène 15, rue de la Fontaine F-47140 Penne d'Agenais / FR | [2001/31] | Representative(s) | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano' & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2001/31] | De Gregori, Antonella, et al Ing. Barzano & Zanardo Milano S.p.A. Via Borgonuovo 10 20121 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 99950636.3 | 07.10.1999 | [2001/31] | WO1999EP07446 | Priority number, date | IT1998MI02175 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: IT MI982175 | [2001/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0021968 | Date: | 20.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1119572 | Date: | 01.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C07F7/21, G03C1/685 | [2001/31] | CPC: |
C07F7/21 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2004/20] |
Former [2001/31] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | PHOTOCHROME VERBINDUNGEN, HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG IN POLYMERE MATERIALIEN | [2001/31] | English: | PHOTOCHROMATIC COMPOUNDS, PREPARATION, USE IN POLYMERIC MATERIALS | [2001/31] | French: | COMPOSES PHOTOCHROMATIQUES, LEUR PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION DANS DES MATERIAUX POLYMERES | [2001/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.02.2001 | Examination requested [2001/31] | 23.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.07.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/21] | 17.12.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | JPH04235993 [ ] (OKAMOTO, H. ET AL.) | [A] - OKAMOTO, H. ET AL., "organic silicon compounds with photochromic activity", CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (19930208), vol. 118, no. 6, Database accession no. 49360, XP002127084 [A] 1 * abstract * |