Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0219912 | Global Dossier | 19.09.2002 | A3 | WO0219912 | 14.03.2002 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US65776700 | 08.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO02059644 | Global Dossier | 01.08.2002 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US77060401 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020884 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20010032604 | Global Dossier | 25.04.2001 | A | Priority number | Date | US33515999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | EP9907480 | 30.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4828651B | Global Dossier | 30.11.2011 | B2 | JP2011078792 | 21.04.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3935433B | Global Dossier | 20.06.2007 | B2 | JP2004522515 | 29.07.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | IB0200119 | 17.01.2002 | US77060401 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2004508087 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2004 | A | Priority number | Date | EP0110108 | 29.08.2001 | US65776700 | 08.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526230 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9907483 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | US33516099 | 17.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526229 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US33515799 | 17.06.1999 | EP9907482 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526228 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | US33515999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | EP9907480 | 30.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526227 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9907478 | 30.09.1999 | US33515899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526226 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9907476 | 30.09.1999 | US33506099 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2002526225 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9907474 | 30.09.1999 | US33505999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4694692B | Global Dossier | 08.06.2011 | B2 | JP2002526224 | 20.08.2002 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9907473 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1358507 | Global Dossier | 28.03.2007 | B1 | EP1358507 | 05.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IB0200119 | 17.01.2002 | US77060401 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1317210 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP0110108 | 29.08.2001 | US65776700 | 08.09.2000 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046063 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907483 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | US33516099 | 17.06.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046062 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907474 | 30.09.1999 | US33505999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046061 | Global Dossier | 26.01.2005 | B1 | EP1046061 | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907473 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046060 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33515799 | 17.06.1999 | EP9907482 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046058 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2006 | B1 | EP1046058 | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907476 | 30.09.1999 | US33506099 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046057 | Global Dossier | 16.02.2005 | B1 | EP1046057 | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907478 | 30.09.1999 | US33515899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1046059 | Global Dossier | 25.10.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33515999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | EP9907480 | 30.09.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE358282T | 15.04.2007 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US77060401 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60219138T | 10.01.2008 | T2 | DE60219138D1 | 10.05.2007 | D1 | Priority number | Date | IB0200119 | 17.01.2002 | US77060401 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69923430T | 16.02.2006 | T2 | DE69923430D1 | 03.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907473 | 30.09.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69923764T | 13.04.2006 | T2 | DE69923764D1 | 24.03.2005 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907478 | 30.09.1999 | US33515899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69933851T | 30.08.2007 | T2 | DE69933851D1 | 14.12.2006 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9907476 | 30.09.1999 | US33506099 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6547732 | 15.04.2003 | B2 | US2001014773 | 16.08.2001 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33505899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | US77060401 | 26.01.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6544177 | 08.04.2003 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33505899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | US65776700 | 08.09.2000 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020890 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | US33516099 | 17.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020889 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33515799 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020888 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33515999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020887 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33515899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020886 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33506099 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0020885 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US33505999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6117081 | 12.09.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US33506099 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6126598 | 03.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US33515899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6126599 | 03.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US33515999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6135956 | 24.10.2000 | A | Priority number | Date | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | US33516099 | 17.06.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6210328 | 03.04.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33505899 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6224552 | 01.05.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33515799 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6283917 | 04.09.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US33505999 | 17.06.1999 | US10292398 | 01.10.1998 |