EP1046059 - ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SYSTEM WITH REAL SPATIAL COMPOUNDING PROCESSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2008 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.06.2008 [2008/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAGO, James, R. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
PEDERSEN, Robert, H. Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 44 5656 AE Eindhoven / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/17] | van Oudheusden-Perset, Laure E., et al Société Civile SPID 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2005/09] | Charpail, François, et al Société Civile S.P.I.D. 156, Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2000/43] | Lottin, Claudine, et al Philips Corporate Intellectual Property, 156 Boulevard Haussmann 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 99950645.4 | 30.09.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999EP07480 | Priority number, date | US19980102923P | 01.10.1998 Original published format: US 102923 P | US19990335159 | 17.06.1999 Original published format: US 335159 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020888 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1046059 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01S7/52 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
G01S15/8913 (EP,US);
G01S15/8995 (EP,US);
G01S7/52025 (EP,US);
G01S7/52034 (EP,US);
G01S7/5205 (EP,US);
G01S7/52057 (EP,US);
G01S7/52065 (EP,US);
G01S7/52085 (EP,US);
G06T1/00 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2000/43] | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALL- DIAGNOSTIK- BILDERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM MIT VERWENDUNG EINES RAUEMLICH KOMPOUNDIERENDEN ECHTZEIT-PROZESSORS | [2000/43] | English: | ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSTIC IMAGING SYSTEM WITH REAL SPATIAL COMPOUNDING PROCESSOR | [2000/43] | French: | SYSTEME ECHOGRAPHIQUE D'IMAGERIE DIAGNOSTIQUE AVEC PROCESSEUR DE COMPOSITION SPATIALE EN TEMPS REEL | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 03.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2000 | Examination requested [2000/50] | 18.07.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.01.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.08.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/24] | 28.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2008/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.10.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.10.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]WO8300993 (LIFE IMAGING CORP [US]) [X] 1,6,10,12,15 * page 6 - page 27; figure - * [Y] 2-5,7-9,11,13,14; | [Y]US4233988 (DICK DONALD E, et al) [Y] 13 * column 2 - column 3 * * column 14, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [Y]US5453575 (O'DONNELL MATTHEW [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,7,8 * column 18, line 61 - column 25, line 8; figure 7 *; | [Y]WO9824065 (ZENECA LTD [GB]) [Y] 5,9,11,14 * page 21 - page 22 *; | [A]US5566674 (WENG LEE [US]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]US5479926 (USTUNER KUTAY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |