EP1131376 - METHOD OF PREPARING RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.08.2004 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2004/11] | For all designated states Bayer MaterialScience AG 51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [2001/37] | For all designated states Bayer Aktiengesellschaft 51368 Leverkusen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHIBA, Takanori deceased / JP | 02 /
MATSUMOTO, Takuya 25-18, Motomachi, Suita Osaka 564-0031 / JP | 03 /
KITANO, Keiichi 53 Jurong East Avenue 1 09-06, Pare Oasis 609783 Singapore / SG | [2001/37] | Application number, filing date | 99950716.3 | 13.10.1999 | [2001/37] | WO1999EP07691 | Priority number, date | JP19980303794 | 26.10.1998 Original published format: JP 30379498 | [2001/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024813 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1131376 | Date: | 12.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08J9/14, B29C44/34, C08J9/30, // C08L75:04 | [2001/37] | CPC: |
C08J9/30 (EP);
B29C44/3442 (EP);
C08G18/1808 (EP);
C08G18/2036 (EP);
C08G18/4018 (EP);
C08G18/4816 (EP);
C08G18/6611 (EP);
C08J9/141 (EP);
C08G2110/0025 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/37] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON POLYURETHANHARTSCHAUMSTOFF | [2001/37] | English: | METHOD OF PREPARING RIGID POLYURETHANE FOAM | [2001/37] | French: | PROCEDE DE PREPARATION D'UNE MOUSSE DE POLYURETHANNE DURE | [2001/37] | Entry into regional phase | 28.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 28.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 28.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/37] | 28.02.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.08.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.04.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/41] | 10.05.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2004/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE19708570 (BASF AG [DE]) [X] 1-3 * Comparative example 1 * * claim - * [Y] 4; | [Y]US4275172 (BARTH BRUCE P, et al) [Y] 4 * column 3, lines 39-45 * * claim - * |