EP1129009 - DEVICE FOR FEEDING TABLETS TO BLISTER PACKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2009 | Change - representative | published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ENTREPRISE DE MECANIQUE ET D'OUTILLAGE 6, rue de Clermont 63300 Thiers / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states Entreprise de Mechanique et d'Outillage 6, rue de Clermont 63300 Thiers / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GAUTHIER, Denis 2, rue de la Mourette F-63110 Beaumont / FR | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 Rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2003/05] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU, BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | ||
Former [2001/36] | Perrier, Jean-Pierre Cabinet GERMAIN & MAUREAU 12 rue de la République 42000 St-Etienne / FR | Application number, filing date | 99950799.9 | 19.10.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999FR02538 | Priority number, date | FR19980014444 | 13.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814444 | [2001/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0029288 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | FR | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129009 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1129009 | Date: | 03.07.2002 | Language: | FR | [2002/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B65B1/36, B65B9/04, B65B5/10, G01F11/40, B65B37/00 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
B65B57/14 (EP,US);
B65B35/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON TABLETTEN IN BLISTER-VERPACKUNGEN | [2001/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR FEEDING TABLETS TO BLISTER PACKS | [2001/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ALIMENTATION EN COMPRIMES DE PLAQUETTES ALVEOLEES | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 30.11.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.04.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 06.04.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.07.2002 | FI | 03.07.2002 | GR | 03.07.2002 | IE | 03.07.2002 | DK | 03.10.2002 | PT | 03.10.2002 | SE | 03.10.2002 | DE | 05.10.2002 | LU | 19.10.2002 | CY | 31.10.2002 | ES | 30.01.2003 | [2004/39] |
Former [2004/10] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
FI | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
CY | 31.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
FI | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
ES | 30.01.2003 | ||
Former [2003/46] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
FI | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
DK | 03.10.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
DE | 05.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/31] | AT | 03.07.2002 | |
FI | 03.07.2002 | ||
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/29] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
IE | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/22] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
PT | 03.10.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/20] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
GR | 03.07.2002 | ||
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/14] | FI | 03.07.2002 | |
SE | 03.10.2002 | ||
Former [2003/03] | SE | 03.10.2002 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE3116481 (KIEPER JOACHIM) [A] 1* figures 2A,2B *; | [DA]DE3842273 (GAMMA SRL [IT]) [DA] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9711884 (IMA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]FR2759346 (EPMO [FR]) [A] 1 * the whole document * |