20.05.2011 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] |
11.06.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] |
08.01.2010 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.02.2010 [2010/06] |
19.06.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2009 [2009/30] |
27.02.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] |
06.02.2009 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.03.2009 [2009/11] |
16.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2009 [2009/08] |
09.01.2009 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.02.2009 [2009/07] |
13.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2008 [2008/50] |
12.11.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2008 [2008/49] |
17.10.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2008 [2008/47] |
29.02.2008 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.04.2008 [2008/14] |
26.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
26.02.2008 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.11.2007 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
12.10.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2007 |
Change - German title |
published on 17.10.2007 [2007/42] |
07.12.2006 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
11.10.2006 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.08.2006 |
First examination report |
|
05.08.2006 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
12.05.2006 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.06.2006 [2006/24] |
18.10.2005 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
13.10.2004 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.10.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.10.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
29.09.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
29.09.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 15.11.2000 [2000/46] |
24.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.07.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
24.11.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|