Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3514730B | Global Dossier | 31.03.2004 | B2 | Priority number | Date | JP30977798 | 30.10.1998 | JP9905933 | 27.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1052035 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2008 | B1 | EP1052035 | 14.06.2006 | A4 | EP1052035 | 15.11.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP30977798 | 30.10.1998 | JP9905933 | 27.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69938449T | 09.04.2009 | T2 | DE69938449D1 | 15.05.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | JP30977798 | 30.10.1998 | JP9905933 | 27.10.1999 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US6295856 | 02.10.2001 | B1 | Priority number | Date | JP30977798 | 30.10.1998 | JP9905933 | 27.10.1999 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO0025954 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2000 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP30977798 | 30.10.1998 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE390965T | 15.04.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | JP30977798 | 30.10.1998 |