EP1141076 - PREPARATION OF A COPOLYETHER ESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.2004 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2003/37] | For all designated states DSM IP Assets B.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | ||
Former [2001/41] | For all designated states DSM N.V. Het Overloon 1 6411 TE Heerlen / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BONTE, Geert, Imelda, Valere Piannesbergstraat 2 B-3590 Diepenbeek / BE | 02 /
WEREMEUS BUNING, Gerard, Hidde Past. Meulenbergstraat 20 NL-6438 HZ Schinnen / NL | 03 /
DIJKSTRA, Krijn Straatsburglaan 54 NL-6137 JB Sittard / NL | 04 /
WARNIER, Jean, Marie, Martinus Maalsteenstraat 4 NL-6129 JH Stein / NL | [2001/41] | Representative(s) | Krijgsman, Willem, et al DSM Intellectual Property Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2002/46] | Krijgsman, Willem, et al DSM Patents & Trademarks Geleen Office P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | ||
Former [2001/41] | Derks, Wilhelmus Hubertus Petrus DSM Patents & Trademarks Office Geleen P.O. Box 9 6160 MA Geleen / NL | Application number, filing date | 99951254.4 | 18.10.1999 | [2001/41] | WO1999NL00647 | Priority number, date | NL19981010385 | 23.10.1998 Original published format: NL 1010385 | [2001/41] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0024803 | Date: | 04.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1141076 | Date: | 10.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1141076 | Date: | 28.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C08G63/672, C08G63/82 | [2001/41] | CPC: |
C08G63/672 (EP,KR,US);
C08G63/82 (EP,US);
C08G63/83 (EP,US);
C08G63/85 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/41] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON COPOLYÄTHERESTERN | [2001/41] | English: | PREPARATION OF A COPOLYETHER ESTER | [2001/41] | French: | PREPARATION D'UN ESTER DE COPOLYETHER | [2001/41] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 20.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/41] | 29.06.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.12.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.05.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.01.2004 | CY | 28.01.2004 | FI | 28.01.2004 | DK | 28.04.2004 | GR | 28.04.2004 | SE | 28.04.2004 | PT | 28.06.2004 | IE | 18.10.2004 | LU | 18.10.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
CY | 28.01.2004 | ||
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
LU | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
IE | 18.10.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
DK | 28.04.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 28.01.2004 | |
FI | 28.01.2004 | ||
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
GR | 28.04.2004 | ||
SE | 28.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 28.01.2004 | |
SE | 28.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [Y]FR2362175 (BAYER AG [DE]) [Y] 1-12 * examples 1-3; claims 1-6 *; | [Y]US4124653 (WHITLOCK KENNETH H) [Y] 1-12 * column 3, line 15 - column 7, line 54 *; | [A]US4452965 (TUNG WILLIAM C T [US]) [A] 1-12* example 1 *; | [A]EP0736560 (ZIMMER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-3,6-12 * claim 1 * |