EP1129329 - TEST PLUG [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.10.2002 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.12.2002 [2002/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-Ticket Enterprises, LLC 509 Firelight Drive Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2001/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCAN, Scott, E. 509 Firelight Drive Santa Rosa, CA 95403 / US | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Shackleton, Nicola, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London, WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | Shackleton, Nicola, et al Page White & Farrer 54 Doughty Street London WC1N 2LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951600.8 | 24.09.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999US22276 | Priority number, date | US19980101758P | 25.09.1998 Original published format: US 101758 P | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019180 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129329 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01M3/04, F16L55/11 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
F16K13/04 (EP,US);
F16L55/1011 (EP,US);
F16L55/11 (EP,US);
F16L55/42 (EP,US);
G01M3/022 (EP,US);
Y10T137/1632 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Title | German: | TESTVERSCHLUSS | [2001/36] | English: | TEST PLUG | [2001/36] | French: | BOUCHON D'ESSAI | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 24.04.2001 | National basic fee paid | 24.04.2001 | Search fee paid | 24.04.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.04.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.04.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 03.04.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2002/49] | 11.06.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2002/49] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2001 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US3338499 (GILBERT EUGENE V); | [A]US3496952 (AMENDOLA MICHAEL R); | [A]US4357960 (HAN HELEN); | [A]US4607664 (CARNEY JOSEPH H [US], et al); | [A]US4739799 (CARNEY JOSEPH H [US], et al); | [A]US5318075 (ROLL MICHAEL K [US]) |