EP1169066 - A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, STAGING, IMAGING AND TREATING GYNECOLOGIC CANCERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2006 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.12.2009 | Change - representative | published on 20.01.2010 [2010/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diadexus, Inc. 343 Oyster Point Boulevard South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US | [2002/33] |
Former [2002/27] | For all designated states diaDexus, Inc. 3303 Octavius Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | ||
Former [2002/02] | For all designated states Diadexus LLC 3303 Octavius Drive Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MACINA, Roberto, A. 4118 Crescendo Avenue San Jose, CA 95136 / US | [2002/02] | Representative(s) | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London W1W 8AG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/03] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1U 6FQ / GB | ||
Former [2002/02] | Suèr, Steven Johannes, et al Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street London W1M 1FD / GB | Application number, filing date | 99951679.2 | 30.09.1999 | [2002/02] | WO1999US22753 | Priority number, date | US19980102743P | 02.10.1998 Original published format: US 102743 P | [2002/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0020044 | Date: | 13.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1169066 | Date: | 09.01.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.04.2000 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.09.2002 | Classification | IPC: | A61K51/00 | [2002/02] | CPC: |
G01N33/57449 (EP);
A61K51/1045 (EP);
C12Q1/6886 (EP);
G01N33/57411 (EP);
G01N33/57415 (EP);
G01N33/57488 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2002/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSTIK, ÜBERWACHUNG, STADIUMFESTSTELLUNG, BILDGEBUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON GYNAEKOLOGISCHEM KREBS | [2005/19] | English: | A NOVEL METHOD OF DIAGNOSING, MONITORING, STAGING, IMAGING AND TREATING GYNECOLOGIC CANCERS | [2002/02] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCEDE POUR DIAGNOSTIQUER, CONTROLER, ETABLIR LE BILAN D'EXTENSION, VISUALISER, ET TRAITER DES CANCERS GYNECOLOGIQUES | [2002/02] |
Former [2002/02] | VERFAHREN ZUR DIAGNOSTIK, ÜBERWACHUNG, STADIUMFESTSTELLUNG, BILDGEBUNG UND BEHANDLUNG VON GYNAEKOLOGISCHER KREBS | Entry into regional phase | 02.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 02.05.2001 | Search fee paid | 02.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 02.05.2001 | Examination requested [2002/02] | 12.09.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/12] | 19.10.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2006/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.09.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]WO9919487 (INCYTE PHRAMACEUTICALS) [PX] 1-11 * figure 1 * * page 12, line 19 - page 13, line 1 * * page 32 - page 39 * * example 4 *; | [Y]WO9807857 (ABBOTT LABORATORIES) [Y] 1-11 * SEQ ID No. 15; page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 15 * * page 11, line 18 - page 12, line 3 *; | [Y]WO9821331 (INCYTE PHARMACEUTICALS, INC) [Y] 1-11 * SEQ ID No. 1; page 21, line 10 - page 22, line 13 * | [PX] - BECKER R M ET AL, "IDENTIFICATION OF MAMMAGLOBIN B, A NOVEL MEMBER OF THE UTEROGLOBIN GENE FAMILY", GENOMICS, ACADEMIC PRESS, SAN DIEGO, US, (1998), vol. 54, no. 1, ISSN 0888-7543, pages 70 - 78, XP000892829 [PX] 1-11 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/geno.1998.5539 | [Y] - WATSON M A ET AL, "MAMMAGLOBIN, A MAMMARY-SPECIFIC MEMBER OF THE UTEROGLOBIN GENE FAMILY, IS OVEREXPRESSED IN HUMAN BREAST CANCER", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, BALTIMORE, MD, US, (19960215), vol. 56, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 860 - 865, XP002048615 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * * figure 1 * | International search | [Y]WO9734997 ; | [A]WO9638463 ; | [Y] - KOSHIYAMA ET AL., "Expression of pS2 protein in endometrial carcinomas: correlation with clinicopathalogic features and sex steroid receptor status", INT. J. CANCER (PRED. ONCOL.),, (1997), vol. 74, pages 237 - 244, XP002924223 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/(SICI)1097-0215(19970620)74:3<237::AID-IJC1>3.0.CO;2-# | [A] - SCHMITT ET AL., "Time-varying prognostic impact of tumour biological factors urokinase (uPA), PAI-1 and steroid hormone receptor status in primary breast cancer", BRITISH J. OF CANCER,, (1997), vol. 76, pages 306 - 311, XP002924224 | [A] - TARDIVEL-LACOMBE ET AL., "Immunohistochemical detection of the sex steroid-binding plasma protein in human mammary carcinoma cells", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN,, (19840130), vol. 118, no. 2, pages 488 - 494, XP002924225 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0006-291X(84)91329-9 | [A] - SASANO ET AL., "Adrenal 4-binding protein in common epithelial and metastatic tumors of the ovary", HUMAN PATHOLOGY,, (199606), vol. 27, no. 6, pages 595 - 598, XP002924226 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0046-8177(96)90168-9 |