EP1073946 - CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN OBJECT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.03.2006 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.03.2006 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.05.2006 [2006/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states C Technologies AB Forskningsbyn Ideon 223 70 Lund / SE | [2001/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
F HRAEUS, Christer Sölvegatan 3 S-223 62 Lund / SE | 02 /
HUGOSSON, Ola Sandgatan 14 B S-223 50 Lund / SE | 03 /
ERICSON, Petter Industrigatan 2 B S-212 14 Malmö / SE | [2001/06] | Representative(s) | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/06] | Perklev, Karin Cecilia, et al AWAPATENT AB, P.O. Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 99952125.5 | 30.04.1999 | [2001/06] | WO1999SE00719 | Priority number, date | SE19980001535 | 30.04.1998 Original published format: SE 9801535 | US19980091323P | 30.06.1998 Original published format: US 91323 P | SE19980003456 | 09.10.1998 Original published format: SE 9803456 | US19980105816P | 27.10.1998 Original published format: US 105816 P | [2001/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9960469 | Date: | 25.11.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1073946 | Date: | 07.02.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.11.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.11.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/033, G06K11/18 | [2001/06] | CPC: |
G06F3/0317 (EP);
G06F3/0354 (KR);
G06F3/03 (KR);
G06F3/0346 (EP);
G06F3/03545 (EP);
G06F3/041 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/06] | Extension states | AL | 13.11.2000 | LT | 13.11.2000 | LV | 13.11.2000 | MK | 13.11.2000 | RO | 13.11.2000 | SI | 13.11.2000 | Title | German: | KONTROLLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM KONTROLLIEREN EINS OBJEKTES | [2001/06] | English: | CONTROL DEVICE AND METHOD OF CONTROLLING AN OBJECT | [2001/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE DE COMMANDE D'UN OBJET | [2001/06] | Entry into regional phase | 13.11.2000 | National basic fee paid | 13.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: SE | 13.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/06] | 02.11.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2006/19] | 05.12.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2006/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2005 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0112415 (IBM [US]); | [A]CN1122925 (YAN GENSHAN [CN]) |