EP1068440 - ELECTROMAGNETICALLY ACTUATED VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.09.2004 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2001/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORBELT, Michael Oberriexinger Weg 4/1 D-71665 Vaihingen / DE | [2001/03] | Application number, filing date | 99952331.9 | 07.08.1999 | [2001/03] | WO1999DE02474 | Priority number, date | DE1998155547 | 02.12.1998 Original published format: DE 19855547 | [2001/03] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0032925 | Date: | 08.06.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1068440 | Date: | 17.01.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1068440 | Date: | 29.10.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02M51/06 | [2001/03] | CPC: |
F02M51/0625 (EP,US);
F16K31/06 (KR);
F02M51/066 (EP,US);
F02M51/0685 (EP,US);
F02M2200/306 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2003/44] |
Former [2001/03] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTROMAGNETISCH BETÄTIGBARES VENTIL | [2001/03] | English: | ELECTROMAGNETICALLY ACTUATED VALVE | [2001/03] | French: | VANNE ELECTROMAGNETIQUE | [2001/03] | Entry into regional phase | 04.09.2000 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/05] | 26.03.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59201966 ; | [A]US4417693 (FUESSNER PAUL [DE], et al) [A] 1-4,9 * figure 1 ** column A *; | [X]GB2196181 (MESENICH GERHARD) [X] 1-3,9 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * page 10, line 105 - page 11, line 50 *; | [X]US5203538 (MATSUNAGA NOBUHIKO [US], et al) [X] 1-3,9 * figure 5 * * column A * * column 4, line 60 - line 68 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19850330), vol. 009, no. 070, Database accession no. (M - 367), & JP59201966 A 19841115 (AISAN KOGYO KK) [A] 1,2,9 * abstract * |