EP1116420 - PRINTED CIRCUIT PLATE USED FOR TESTING ELECTRIC COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.05.2003 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.06.2003 [2003/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2001/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HACKE, Hans-Jürgen Malojaweg 7 D-81475 München / DE | [2001/29] | Representative(s) | Schweiger, Martin, et al Patentanwalt Martin Schweiger Erhardtstraße 12 80469 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/04] | Schweiger, Martin, Dipl.-Ing., et al Leopoldstrasse 77 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/29] | Hanke, Hilmar, et al Leopoldstrasse 77 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 99952417.6 | 16.08.1999 | [2001/29] | WO1999DE02565 | Priority number, date | DE19981037392 | 18.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19837392 | [2001/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0011920 | Date: | 02.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1116420 | Date: | 18.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1116420 | Date: | 26.06.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H05K1/11, G01R1/073, G01R1/04 | [2001/29] | CPC: |
G01R1/0735 (EP,US);
H05K1/112 (EP,US);
H05K3/326 (EP,US);
G01R31/2886 (EP,US);
H05K1/0393 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0394 (EP,US);
H05K2201/09472 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2002/26] |
Former [2001/29] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE ZUR VERWENDUNG BEI DER PRÜFUNG VON ELEKTRISCHEN BAUTEILEN | [2001/29] | English: | PRINTED CIRCUIT PLATE USED FOR TESTING ELECTRIC COMPONENTS | [2001/29] | French: | PLAQUETTE A CIRCUIT IMPRIME DESTINEE A ETRE UTILISEE POUR TESTER DES COMPOSANTS ELECTRIQUES | [2001/29] | Entry into regional phase | 19.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 19.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.02.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/29] | 13.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.12.2001 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.03.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0310302 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]) [A] 1,2,4 * abstract *; | [A]US5537051 (JALLOUL SUHAIL M [US], et al) [A] 1,2,4 * column 3, line 11 - column 4, line 23 * * column 5, line 64 - line 67; figures 5,6 *; | [A]US3818279 (SEEGER R, et al) [A] 1-6 * column W *; | [A]JPH06313788 ; | [A]US5510721 (WALLES BETHANY J [US], et al) [A] 1,6 * column A; figure - *; | [A]US4676564 (MITCHELL JR JOHN W [US]) [A] 1 * figure - *; | [A]US5065506 (KIRIBAYASHI SHOJI [JP]) [A] 7-11 * column 3, line 2 - line 29; figures 3,4 *; | [A]DE3608410 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 7-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JPH0266954 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19980331), vol. 1998, no. 7, & JP06313788 A 19941108 (FRESH QUEST CORP) [A] 1,6 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19900524), vol. 14, no. 244, Database accession no. (E - 0932), & JP02066954 A 19900307 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [A] 7-11 * abstract * |