EP1127355 - PRODUCTS AND METHODS FOR BRACHYTHERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.01.2007 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.12.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 07.01.2009 [2009/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont, Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2006/09] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2005/30] | For all designated states GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Buckinghamshire HP7 9NA / GB | ||
Former [2002/06] | For all designated states Amersham plc The Grove Centre, White Lion Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states NYCOMED AMERSHAM PLC Amersham Laboratories, White Lion Road Amersham Buckinghamshire, HP7 9LL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCINTIRE, Gregory, Lynn 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | 02 /
SNOW, Robert, A. 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | 03 /
BACON, Edward, R. 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | 04 /
ERIKSEN, Morten Nycoveien 1-2, P.O. Box 4220, Torshov 0401 Oslo / NO | 05 /
TORNES, Auden Nycoveien 1-2, P.O Box 4220, Torshov 0401 Oslo / NO | 06 /
COONEY, Geraldine, Fry 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | 07 /
GATES, Virginia, Ann 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | 08 /
CORNACOFF, Joel 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | 09 /
BLACK, Christopher, D., V. 466 Devon Park Drive, P.O. Box 6630 Wayne, PA 19087-8630 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell GE Healthcare Limited Amersham Place Little Chalfont Bucks. HP7 9NA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Hammett, Audrey Grace Campbell Nycomed Amersham plc, Amersham Laboratories, White Lion Road Amersham, Buckinghamshire HP7 9LL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99952712.0 | 05.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999GB03668 | Priority number, date | US19980107406P | 06.11.1998 Original published format: US 107406 P | GB19980026121 | 27.11.1998 Original published format: GB 9826121 | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0028554 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127355 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127355 | Date: | 01.03.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G21G4/08 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
A61N5/1027 (EP,US);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P9/08 (EP);
G21G4/08 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3925 (EP,US);
A61N2005/1024 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2006/09] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNGEN UND VERFAHREN FÜR BRACHYTHERAPIE | [2001/35] | English: | PRODUCTS AND METHODS FOR BRACHYTHERAPY | [2001/35] | French: | PRODUITS ET METHODES DE BRACHYTHERAPIE | [2001/35] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.03.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.03.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.03.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 16.08.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.12.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.11.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 18.11.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.12.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 01.03.2006 | CH | 01.03.2006 | CY | 01.03.2006 | FI | 01.03.2006 | LI | 01.03.2006 | SE | 01.06.2006 | GR | 02.06.2006 | PT | 01.08.2006 | LU | 05.11.2006 | IE | 06.11.2006 | MC | 30.11.2006 | [2009/02] |
Former [2008/36] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
LU | 05.11.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
GR | 02.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2008/18] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
IE | 06.11.2006 | ||
MC | 30.11.2006 | ||
Former [2007/23] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
PT | 01.08.2006 | ||
Former [2006/46] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
SE | 01.06.2006 | ||
Former [2006/43] | AT | 01.03.2006 | |
CH | 01.03.2006 | ||
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/42] | CH | 01.03.2006 | |
FI | 01.03.2006 | ||
LI | 01.03.2006 | ||
Former [2006/36] | FI | 01.03.2006 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4401124 (GUESS JOE F [US], et al) [A] 5,7,8,10 * column 2, line 3 - line 32; figure - *; | [A]US4869259 (ELKINS DEXTER J [US]) [A] 11,12 * column 3, line 27 - column 4, line 11 * * figure 5 *; | [Y]EP0624342 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [Y] 1-5,7-10,16-19 * column 2, line 2 - line 26 * * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 12 * * column 4, line 50 - column 6, line 23 * * figure - *; | [Y] - "RADIOACTIVE SEEDS FOR PERMANENT PROSTATE IMPLANTS", URL: http://www.moffitt.usf.edu/clinical_programs/genitou/patweb/seeds.htm, (20000201), XP002129761 [Y] 1-5,7-10,16-19 * the whole document * | [DA] - GRIMM ET AL., "Ultrasound-guided transperineal implantation of Iodine-125 and Palladium-103 for the treatment of early-stage prostate cancer", ATLAS OF THE UROLOGIC CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, (199410), vol. 2, no. 2, pages 113 - 125, XP000869992 [DA] 3,9,14,16-21 * page 117, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 3 * * page 119, column L, paragraph L - column R, paragraph 1 * * page 123, column L, paragraph 1 * | [DA] - BLASKO ET AL., "Should brachytherapy be considered a therapeutic option in localized prostate cancer?", THE UROLOGIC CLINICS OF NORTH AMERICA, (199611), vol. 223, no. 4, pages 633 - 650, XP000870078 [DA] 3,9,16-19 * page 634, column L, paragraph 2 * * page 637, column R, paragraph 1 - paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0094-0143(05)70342-6 |