EP1128772 - DEVICE FOR THE OSTEOSYNTHESIS OF A SPINAL SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.04.2004 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2008 | Change - representative | published on 13.08.2008 [2008/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SOCIETE DE FABRICATION DE MATERIEL ORTHOPEDIQUE SOFAMOR 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states SOCIETE DE FABRICATION DE MATERIEL ORTHOPEDIQUE SOFAMOR 13, rue de la Perdrix 93290 Tremblay-en-France / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRIESEM, Tai Shivat Zion 31 44286 Ksar Saba / IL | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2001/36] | Neyret, Daniel, et al c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 99952747.6 | 11.11.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999IB01813 | Priority number, date | FR19980014210 | 12.11.1998 Original published format: FR 9814210 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0028905 | Date: | 25.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1128772 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1128772 | Date: | 11.06.2003 | Language: | EN | [2003/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 25.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/70 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
A61B17/7002 (EP,US);
A61B17/7032 (EP,US);
A61B17/7044 (EP,US);
A61B17/7011 (EP,US);
A61B17/7037 (EP,US);
A61B17/7041 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GERÄT ZUR OSTEOSYNTHESE EINES WIRBELSEGMENTES | [2001/36] | English: | DEVICE FOR THE OSTEOSYNTHESIS OF A SPINAL SEGMENT | [2001/36] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'OSTEOSYNTHESE D'UN SEGMENT DE LA COLONNE VERTEBRALE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 16.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 16.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 16.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 12.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.09.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.03.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.06.2003 | CH | 11.06.2003 | FI | 11.06.2003 | FR | 11.06.2003 | LI | 11.06.2003 | NL | 11.06.2003 | DK | 11.09.2003 | GR | 11.09.2003 | PT | 11.09.2003 | SE | 11.09.2003 | CY | 11.11.2003 | IE | 11.11.2003 | LU | 11.11.2003 | MC | 30.11.2003 | [2006/14] |
Former [2005/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 11.11.2003 | ||
IE | 11.11.2003 | ||
LU | 11.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 11.11.2003 | ||
LU | 11.11.2003 | ||
MC | 30.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/39] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 11.11.2003 | ||
LU | 11.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/36] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
CY | 11.11.2003 | ||
Former [2004/29] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
DK | 11.09.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/10] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
SE | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/05] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
FI | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | ||
Former [2004/03] | AT | 11.06.2003 | |
CH | 11.06.2003 | ||
LI | 11.06.2003 | ||
NL | 11.06.2003 | ||
GR | 11.09.2003 | ||
PT | 11.09.2003 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE4447002 (ASAHI OPTICAL CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0705572 (SYNTHES AG [CH]) |