28.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
03.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.03.2006 [2006/12] |
17.12.2004 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
19.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
03.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
30.07.2004 |
Change - representative |
published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] |
26.03.2004 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] |
26.12.2003 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 11.02.2004 [2004/07] |
13.12.2003 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
13.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.11.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.07.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.02.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.04.2003 [2003/16] |
24.01.2003 |
Change - representative |
published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] |
30.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.10.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.09.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.08.2002 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.09.2002 [2002/38] |
21.05.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.03.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
02.11.2001 |
First examination report |
|
26.10.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
20.07.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
20.07.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 05.09.2001 [2001/36] |
05.06.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.05.2001 |
Change - extension states |
|
31.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
28.05.2001 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.06.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.02.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|