EP1129578 - SIGNALLING OF BOUQUET INFORMATION IN A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.12.2004 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Thomson Licensing SA 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2004/20] | For all designated states THOMSON Licensing S.A. 46, Quai Alphonse Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2002/38] | For all designated states Canal+ Technologies 34, Place Raoul Dautry 75015 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/36] | For all designated states CANAL+ Société Anonyme 85/89 Quai André Citroen 75711 Paris Cedex 15 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REY, François 10, Montee saint Jean F-73370 Le Bourget du Lac / FR | 02 /
POULAIN, Philippe 23, rue Alain Chartier F-75015 Paris / FR | [2001/36] | Representative(s) | Kohrs, Martin TECHNICOLOR 1-5, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92130 Issy-les-Moulineaux / FR | [N/P] |
Former [N/P] | Kohrs, Martin Thomson 1, rue Jeanne d'Arc 92443 Issy-les-Moulineaux Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2004/38] | Kohrs, Martin Thomson multimedia 46, quai A. Le Gallo 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | ||
Former [2003/16] | Rinuy, Santarelli 14, avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2003/11] | Stankoff, Hélène, et al Cabinet Rinuy, Santarelli 14 avenue de la Grande Armée 75017 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2001/36] | Cozens, Paul Dennis, et al Mathys & Squire 100 Grays Inn Road London WC1X 8AL / GB | Application number, filing date | 99952762.5 | 05.11.1999 | [2001/36] | WO1999IB01841 | Priority number, date | EP19980402774 | 09.11.1998 Original published format: EP 98402774 | [2001/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0028742 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1129578 | Date: | 05.09.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1129578 | Date: | 11.02.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/24 | [2001/36] | CPC: |
H04N21/235 (EP,US);
H04N7/015 (KR);
H04N21/435 (EP,US);
H04N7/165 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/36] | Extension states | AL | 22.05.2001 | LT | 22.05.2001 | LV | 22.05.2001 | MK | 22.05.2001 | RO | 22.05.2001 | SI | 22.05.2001 | Title | German: | SIGNALISIERUNG VON BOUQUETINFORMATION IN EINEM DIGITALEN ÜBERTRAGUNGSSYSTEM | [2001/36] | English: | SIGNALLING OF BOUQUET INFORMATION IN A DIGITAL TRANSMISSION SYSTEM | [2001/36] | French: | SIGNALISATION D'INFORMATIONS RELATIVES AU BOUQUET DANS UN SYSTEME DE TRANSMISSION NUMERIQUE | [2001/36] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/36] | 02.11.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.05.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.08.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.11.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 07.11.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.11.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.02.2004 | BE | 11.02.2004 | CH | 11.02.2004 | CY | 11.02.2004 | FI | 11.02.2004 | LI | 11.02.2004 | NL | 11.02.2004 | DK | 11.05.2004 | GR | 11.05.2004 | SE | 11.05.2004 | PT | 11.07.2004 | IE | 05.11.2004 | LU | 05.11.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
CY | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
IE | 05.11.2004 | ||
LU | 05.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/13] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
IE | 05.11.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
NL | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
DK | 11.05.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
BE | 11.02.2004 | ||
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
CH | 11.02.2004 | ||
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
LI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 11.02.2004 | |
FI | 11.02.2004 | ||
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
GR | 11.05.2004 | ||
SE | 11.05.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 11.02.2004 | |
SE | 11.05.2004 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0827336 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO9817024 (SARNOFF CORP [US]); |