EP1126960 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING FOAMS MADE OF POLYMERS OR POLYMER MIXTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2001/35] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FOAMS MADE OF POLYMERS OR POLYMER MIXTURES AND MOULDED ARTICLES MADE FROM SAID FOAMS | ||
[2003/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.06.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.06.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 21.07.2004 [2004/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Membrana GmbH Oehder Strasse 28 42289 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/03] | For all designated states Membrana GmbH öhder Strasse 28 42289 Wuppertal / DE | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states GKSS-FORSCHUNGSZENTRUM GEESTHACHT GMBH Max-Planck-Strasse 21502 Geesthacht / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Quan Borgfelder Strasse 16 D-20537 Hamburg / DE | 02 /
PAUL, Dieter Wolfswerder 25 D-14532 Kleinmachnow / DE | 03 /
SEIBIG, Bernd Strandweg 17 D-21502 Geesthacht / DE | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Fett, Günter CPW GmbH Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Fett, Günter Acordis AG Kasinostrasse 19-21 42103 Wuppertal / DE | Application number, filing date | 99953595.8 | 26.08.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999DE02662 | Priority number, date | DE1998150340 | 02.11.1998 Original published format: DE 19850340 | [2001/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026006 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1126960 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1126960 | Date: | 30.07.2003 | Language: | DE | [2003/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B29C44/34 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
B01D67/002 (EP,US);
B01D69/06 (EP,US);
B01D69/08 (EP,US);
B01D71/50 (EP,US);
B29C44/3446 (EP,US);
B29C44/348 (EP,US);
B29C48/10 (EP,US);
B29C48/29 (EP,US);
B01D2323/10 (EP,US);
B01D2323/24 (EP,US);
B01D2325/026 (EP,US);
B29C48/05 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [2003/31] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHÄUMEN AUS POLYMEREN ODER POLYMERGEMISCHEN | [2003/12] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FOAMS MADE OF POLYMERS OR POLYMER MIXTURES | [2003/12] | French: | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSES A BASE DE POLYMERES OU DE MELANGES POLYMERES | [2003/12] |
Former [2001/35] | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON SCHÄUMEN AUS POLYMEREN ODER POLYMERGEMISCHEN SOWIE DARAUS HERSTELLBARER FORMKÖRPER | ||
Former [2001/35] | METHOD FOR PRODUCING FOAMS MADE OF POLYMERS OR POLYMER MIXTURES AND MOULDED ARTICLES MADE FROM SAID FOAMS | ||
Former [2001/35] | PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE MOUSSES A BASE DE POLYMERES OU DE MELANGES POLYMERES ET CORPS MOULES POUVANT ETRE REALISES AVEC LESDITES MOUSSES | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.05.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 17.06.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.10.2002 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.03.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 27.03.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2004/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.10.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US5707573 (BIESENBERGER JOSEPH A [US], et al); | [X]US5753717 (SANYASI GRAHAM RAMLU [AU]) |