EP1050099 - ELECTRIC DRIVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2007 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.10.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.11.2007 [2007/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | [2006/48] |
Former [2000/45] | For all designated states ROBERT BOSCH GMBH Postfach 30 02 20 70442 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUK, Detlef Badstrasse 20 D-77871 Renchen / DE | 02 /
FISCHER, Ernst Ludwig-Dill-Strasse 6 D-76593 Gernsbach / DE | 03 /
KARCHER, Hansjoerg Buechelbachstrasse 6 D-77830 Bühlertal / DE | 04 /
HERP, Juergen Am Neuen Weg 13 D-77815 Bühl / DE | 05 /
MAURER, Erik Buschenbergweg 10 D-77830 Bühlertal / DE | 06 /
WIEGERT, Andreas Russhaldeweg 28 D-77876 Kappelrodeck / DE | 07 /
HURST, Richard Gottswaldstrasse 8a D-77656 Offenburg / DE | 08 /
WAIBEL, Anton Dr.-Fr.-Zimmermann-Strasse 39 D-88709 Hagnau / DE | [2000/45] | Application number, filing date | 99953618.8 | 27.08.1999 | [2000/45] | WO1999DE02687 | Priority number, date | DE1998139407 | 29.08.1998 Original published format: DE 19839407 | [2000/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0013295 | Date: | 09.03.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1050099 | Date: | 08.11.2000 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1050099 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2000 | Classification | IPC: | H02K7/08, H02K5/173, F16C35/067, F16C27/08 | [2000/45] | CPC: |
F16C35/067 (EP,US);
H02K7/08 (KR);
F16C25/08 (EP,US);
F16C27/08 (EP,US);
H02K5/1732 (EP,US);
H02K7/081 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2004/21] |
Former [2000/45] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE ANTRIEBSEINHEIT | [2000/45] | English: | ELECTRIC DRIVE UNIT | [2000/45] | French: | UNITE D'ENTRAINEMENT ELECTRIQUE | [2000/45] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.09.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.09.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.09.2000 | Examination requested [2000/45] | 20.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.09.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.09.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.08.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.08.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.08.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US3469897 (RIKE HOWARD W) [Y] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1450909 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT) [A] 1* page 1, line 33 - line 63; figure 1 *; | [Y]US5027024 (SLAYTON ALVIN L [US]) [Y] 1,2 * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 60; figures 1-3 *; | [A]FR2748436 (VALEO SYSTEMES DESSUYAGE [FR]) [A] 1 * page 1, line 15 - line 33; figure - *; | [PDX]DE19727120 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [PDX] 1 * column 2, line 35 - line 45; figure . * |