28.03.2008 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] |
04.05.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.06.2007 [2007/23] |
10.02.2006 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.03.2006 [2006/13] |
23.09.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] |
18.03.2005 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.05.2005 [2005/18] |
14.01.2005 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 02.03.2005 [2005/09] |
17.12.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2005 [2005/05] |
26.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.01.2005 [2005/02] |
19.11.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.01.2005 [2005/01] |
10.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.10.2004 [2004/44] |
03.09.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.2004 [2004/43] |
20.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.10.2004 [2004/41] |
13.08.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.09.2004 [2004/40] |
24.01.2004 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.03.2004 [2004/11] |
17.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
17.12.2003 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
11.11.2003 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.08.2003 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
07.02.2003 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
15.11.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
11.11.2002 |
Renewal fee |
|
23.07.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
29.04.2002 |
Examination report or reply |
|
19.04.2002 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.06.2002 [2002/23] |
21.12.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
23.11.2001 |
First examination report |
|
22.11.2001 |
Examination report or reply |
|
12.11.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.12.2000 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |
22.12.2000 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 07.02.2001 [2001/06] |
27.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.09.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.08.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.05.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|