EP1127120 - GENOMIC AND COMPLETE CDNA SEQUENCES OF HUMAN ADIPOCYTE-SPECIFIC APM1 AND BIALLELIC MARKERS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.04.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Serono Genetics Institute S.A. Route Nationale 7 91000 Evry Cedex / FR | [2007/42] |
Former [2004/52] | For all designated states Serono Genetics Institute S.A. Route Nationale 7 91030 Evry Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2003/42] | For all designated states Genset Route Nationale 7 91000 Evry / FR | ||
Former [2001/35] | For all designated states GENSET 24, rue Royale 75008 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUFAURE-GARE, Isabelle 1 bis, rue d'Alésia F-75014 Paris / FR | 02 /
BOUGUELERET, Lydie 108, avenue Victor-Hugo F-92170 Vanves / FR | 03 /
BLUMENFELD, Marta 5, rue Tagore F-75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
BIHAIN, Bernard 238 View Lane Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2001/35] | Representative(s) | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/35] | Brasnett, Adrian Hugh, et al Mewburn Ellis York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 99954295.4 | 04.11.1999 | [2001/35] | WO1999IB01858 | Priority number, date | US19980107113P | 04.11.1998 Original published format: US 107113 P | US19990119593P | 10.02.1999 Original published format: US 119593 P | [2001/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0026363 | Date: | 11.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1127120 | Date: | 29.08.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1127120 | Date: | 28.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/12, C07K14/47, C12Q1/68, C12N15/11, A01K67/027, C07K16/18 | [2001/35] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6883 (EP,US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
A01K2217/05 (EP,US);
C12Q2600/156 (EP,US);
Y10S977/928 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2008/22] |
Former [2001/35] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GENOMISCHE UND VOLLSTÄNDIGE CDNA SEQUENZEN VON MENSCHLICHEM ADIPOZYTEN SPEZIFISCHEM APM1 UND BIALLELISCHE MARKER DAVON | [2007/42] | English: | GENOMIC AND COMPLETE CDNA SEQUENCES OF HUMAN ADIPOCYTE-SPECIFIC APM1 AND BIALLELIC MARKERS THEREOF | [2001/35] | French: | SEQUENCES D'ADNC GENOMIQUES ET COMPLETES D'APM1 HUMAIN SPECIFIQUE D'ADIPOCYTES ET MARQUEURS BIALLELIQUES DE CES DERNIERS | [2001/35] |
Former [2001/35] | GENOMISCHE UND VOLLSTÄNDIGEN CDNA SEQUENZEN VON MENSCHLICHE ADIPOZYTEN SPEZIFISCHE APM1 UND BIALLELISCHE MARKER DAVON | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2001 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.05.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 22.05.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.05.2001 | Examination requested [2001/35] | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.03.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.10.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.08.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time | 03.04.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 03.04.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.03.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/19] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to fulfill actions required for granting the patent | 03.04.2008 | Request for further processing filed | 03.04.2008 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 24.04.2008 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.05.2008 | BE | 28.05.2008 | CY | 28.05.2008 | DK | 28.05.2008 | FI | 28.05.2008 | NL | 28.05.2008 | SE | 28.08.2008 | GR | 29.08.2008 | PT | 28.10.2008 | IE | 04.11.2008 | LU | 04.11.2008 | MC | 30.11.2008 | [2011/25] |
Former [2010/44] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
CY | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 04.11.2008 | ||
LU | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/28] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 04.11.2008 | ||
LU | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2010/06] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
IE | 04.11.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/30] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
MC | 30.11.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
BE | 28.05.2008 | ||
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
PT | 28.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
DK | 28.05.2008 | ||
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | ||
SE | 28.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/49] | AT | 28.05.2008 | |
FI | 28.05.2008 | ||
NL | 28.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO9639429 (WHITEHEAD BIOMEDICAL INST [US], et al) [X] 18,54,55 * the whole document *; | [PY]WO9907736 (GENSET SA [FR], et al) [PY] 1-16,18-55 * page 17; table 1 *; | [PX]WO9910492 (ZYMOGENETICS INC [US]) [PX] 1-16,19-53 * the whole document *; | [PX]WO9921577 (OTSUKA PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 18,54,55 * the whole document *; | [X] - MAEDA, KAZUHISA ET AL, "CDNA cloning and expression of a novel adipose specific collagen-like factor, apM1 (adipose most abundant gene transcript 1.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1996) VOL. 221, NO. 2, PP. 286-289., XP000612064 [X] 1-16,19-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1996.0587 | [Y] - SCHAFFLER, A. ET AL, "Identification and characterization of the human adipocyte apM-1 promoter", BIOCHIM. BIOPHYS. ACTA (1998), 1399(2-3), 187-197, (1998), XP000874484 [Y] 1-16,18-55 * the whole document * | [PX] - SAITO K ET AL, "Organization of the gene for gelatin-binding protein (GBP28)", GENE,NL,ELSEVIER BIOMEDICAL PRESS. AMSTERDAM, (19990318), vol. 229, no. 1-2, ISSN 0378-1119, pages 67 - 73, XP004161159 [PX] 1-16,19-53 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-1119(99)00041-4 | [PY] - SCHAFFLER, A. ET AL, "The human apM-1, an adipocyte-specific gene linked to the family of TNF's and to genes expressed in activated T cells, is mapped to chromosome 1q21.3-q23, a susceptibility locus identified for familial combined hyperlipidaemia (FCH)", BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN. (1999), 260(2), 416-425, (1999), XP000867718 [PY] 1-16,18-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0865 | [PY] - ARITA, YUKIO ET AL, "Paradoxical decrease of an adipose-specific protein, adiponectin, in obesity.", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (APRIL 2, 1999) VOL. 257, NO. 1, PP. 79-83., XP000867719 [PY] 1-16,18-55 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/bbrc.1999.0255 |