EP1045942 - GROUND ENGAGING TOOLS FOR EARTHWORKING IMPLEMENTS AND RETAINER THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.05.2003 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.03.2004 | Change - designated states | published on 12.05.2004 [2004/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 N.E. Adams Street Peoria IL 61629-6490 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | For all designated states CATERPILLAR INC. 100 Northeast Adams Street Peoria Illinois 61629-6490 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STICKLING, Christopher, J. 12911 N. Bland Road Dunlap, IL 61525 / US | [2000/43] | Representative(s) | Gordon, Naoise Padhraic Edward Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/43] | Gordon, Naoise Padhraic Edward Murgitroyd & Company, 373 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8QA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955026.2 | 19.10.1999 | [2000/43] | WO1999US24367 | Priority number, date | US19980187678 | 06.11.1998 Original published format: US 187678 | [2000/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0028160 | Date: | 18.05.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1045942 | Date: | 25.10.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.05.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.05.2000 | Classification | IPC: | E02F9/28 | [2000/43] | CPC: |
E02F9/2825 (EP,KR,US);
E02F9/2841 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2004/20] |
Former [2000/43] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | GRUND GREIFENDE WERKZEUGE FÜR ERDBEARBEITUNGSGERÄTE UND HALTERUNG DAFÜR | [2000/43] | English: | GROUND ENGAGING TOOLS FOR EARTHWORKING IMPLEMENTS AND RETAINER THEREFOR | [2000/43] | French: | OUTILS DE TERRASSEMENT DESTINES A DES EQUIPEMENTS DE TERRASSEMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE RETENUE ASSOCIE | [2000/43] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2000 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.07.2000 | Examination requested [2000/43] | 13.08.2002 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/26] | 27.01.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2003/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PXA]WO9923315 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [PX] 1,2,9,10,13-15,20-22 * page 5, line 31 - page 6, line 7 * * page 6, line 24 - page 8, line 5 * * page 8, line 6 - line 14 * * figures 1-3,5 * [A] 4,5,7,8,11,12,16-18; | [XA]WO9844208 (CATERPILLAR INC [US]) [X] 1,2,9,10,20 * figure - * * page 12, line 23 - page 15, line 27 * [A] 4,5,7,8,11-15,17,18,21; | [XA]US2861362 (MAURICE LIARD, et al) [X] 1,20 * figure - * [A] 7,9,10; | [A]US2610417 (CRAWFORD ARTHUR N) [A] 1-3,7,9,10,17 * figure - *; | [A]US2325991 (WHITE MARSHALL J) [A] 1,5,7,9,10,20 * figure - *; | [A]US3325926 (WILSON WILLIAM W) [A] 2,3,5,6,8,17,19 * figures 6,8,9 *; | [XA]DE1652484 (DELORO UGINE CARBONE) [X] 1,20 * figure - * * column 3 * * column 4 * [A] 5,7,9,10,21-23; | [A]US5088214 (JONES LARREN F [US]) [A] 1,20 * figure - * |