EP1047933 - ENCAPSULATED IPG STRIPS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2006 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.07.2006 [2006/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BIO-RAD LABORATORIES, INC. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules, CA 94547 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states BIO-RAD LABORATORIES, INC. 1000 Alfred Nobel Drive Hercules California 94547 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OLECH, Lee 651 Lake Avenue, No. 1 Rodeo, CA 94572 / US | 02 /
HARBERS, Adriana, J. 4015 Providence Drive Martinez, CA 94553 / US | [2000/44] | Representative(s) | West, Alan Harry R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | West, Alan Harry R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955099.9 | 20.10.1999 | [2000/44] | WO1999US24628 | Priority number, date | US19980195983 | 19.11.1998 Original published format: US 195983 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0031526 | Date: | 02.06.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1047933 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.06.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2000/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1047933 | Date: | 17.08.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.06.2000 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/447, B01D57/02 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
G01N27/44795 (EP,US);
G01N27/44747 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2000/44] | Title | German: | EINGEKAPSELTE IPG-STREIFEN | [2000/44] | English: | ENCAPSULATED IPG STRIPS | [2000/44] | French: | BANDES IPG ENCAPSULEES | [2000/44] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2000 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/02] | 12.01.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.05.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.10.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9613717 (VISIBLE GENETICS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 13-18; figure 1 *; | [A]WO9313410 (FMC CORP [US]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]WO9634276 (BRUN HEIDI M [IL], et al) [A] 1 * page 4, lines 16-19 *; | [A]US5773645 (HOCHSTRASSER DENIS FRANÇOIS [CH]) [A] 1 * column 3, lines 33-67 *; | [AP]WO9857161 (HOEFER PHARMACIA BIOTECH INC [US], et al) [AP] 1 * pages 2-3; claims 13-22 *; | [AP]WO9933550 (MACQUARIE RES LTD [AU], et al) [AP] 1 * pages 1-3 *; | [AP]WO9859092 (LARGE SCALE BIOLOGY CORP [US]) [AP] 1 * pages 1-5 * |