EP1082065 - TRANSFER JIG FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS AND METHOD FOR MAKING A MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2005 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.11.2005 [2005/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osteo-TI Limited Transport House, Commercial Road St Sampsons Guernsey GY2 4QP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/11] | For all designated states Osteo-TI Limited Transport House, Commercial Road St Sampsons, Guernsey GY2 4QP / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HARDING, Stewart, Peter Les Rosiers, Bray Road Guernsey / GB | [2001/11] | Representative(s) | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al Cleveland 10 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2005/02] | Faulkner, Thomas John, et al fJ Cleveland, 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2004/05] | Howson, Richard G.B. fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | ||
Former [2001/11] | Baldwin, Mark, et al fJ Cleveland 40-43 Chancery Lane London WC2A 1JQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955202.9 | 01.06.1999 | [2001/11] | WO1999GB01734 | Priority number, date | GB19980011869 | 02.06.1998 Original published format: GB 9811869 | [2001/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9962421 | Date: | 09.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1082065 | Date: | 14.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1082065 | Date: | 17.11.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | A61C8/00 | [2001/11] | CPC: |
A61C8/0001 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, SE [2001/11] | Title | German: | SPANNVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERFÜHRUNG VON DENTALIMPLANTATEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANFERTIGUNG EINES MODELLS | [2004/27] | English: | TRANSFER JIG FOR DENTAL IMPLANTS AND METHOD FOR MAKING A MODEL | [2001/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT D'IMPLANTS DENTAIRES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION D'UN MODELE | [2001/11] |
Former [2001/11] | SPANNVORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERFÜHRUNG VON DENTALIMPLANTATEN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANFERTIGUNG EINES METALLS | Entry into regional phase | 06.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 06.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 06.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/11] | 07.10.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.02.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2004 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 21.08.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.08.2005 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [DA]WO9629019 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH], et al) [DA] 1,3,6,9,10 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9728755 (STRAUMANN INST AG [CH], et al) [A] 1 * page 9, line 21 - line 23; figure 1 *; | [A]US5334024 (NIZNICK GERALD A [US]) [A] 1,7 * column 2, line 16 - line 22 * | by applicant | WO9320774 | WO9629019 |