Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1086089
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |
22.11.2002 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 08.01.2003 [2003/02] |
30.11.2001 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 16.01.2002 [2002/03] |
21.08.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
06.07.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
29.05.2001 |
Renewal fee |
|
11.05.2001 |
First examination report |
|
10.05.2001 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.02.2001 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
09.02.2001 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] |
20.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.11.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.01.2000 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.12.1999 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|