EP1144017 - SHAPE-FORMED, THREE DIMENSIONAL, MOISTURE VAPOUR PERMEABLE, LIQUID IMPERMEABLE ARTICLES COMPRISING MOISTURE VAPOUR PERMEABLE, LIQUID IMPERMEABLE STRUCTURES COMPRISING LOW VISCOSITY THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.05.2004 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.07.2004 [2004/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CORZANI, Italo Via Fontevecchia, 40 I-66100 Chieti / IT | 02 /
PALUMBO, Gianfranco Georgenfeld 7 D-61348 Bad Homburg / DE | [2001/42] | Representative(s) | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/42] | Veronese, Pancrazio, et al Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65823 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | Application number, filing date | 99955434.8 | 09.06.1999 | [2001/42] | WO1999US13073 | Priority number, date | EP19980110597 | 09.06.1998 Original published format: EP 98110597 | [2001/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9964078 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1144017 | Date: | 17.10.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.12.2001 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/00 | [2001/42] | CPC: |
C08K5/11 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/225 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/24 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/26 (EP,KR,US);
A61L15/42 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/1345 (EP,KR,US)
| C-Set: |
C08K5/11, C08L77/00 (EP,US);
C08K5/1345, C08L77/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, NL, PT, SE [2001/42] | Title | German: | GEFORMTE DREIDIMENSIONAL FEUCHTIGKEITSDURCHLÄSSIGE ABER FLÜSSIGKEITSUNDURCHLÄSSIGE GEGENSTÄNDE MIT FEUCHTIGKEITSDURCHLÄSSIGEN ABER FLÜSSIGKEITSUNDURCHLÄSSIGEN STRUKTUREN MIT THERMOPLASTISCHER NIEDRIGVISKOSER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2001/42] | English: | SHAPE-FORMED, THREE DIMENSIONAL, MOISTURE VAPOUR PERMEABLE, LIQUID IMPERMEABLE ARTICLES COMPRISING MOISTURE VAPOUR PERMEABLE, LIQUID IMPERMEABLE STRUCTURES COMPRISING LOW VISCOSITY THERMOPLASTIC COMPOSITIONS | [2001/42] | French: | ARTICLES FA ONNES TRIDIMENSIONNELS, PERMEABLES A LA VAPEUR D'EAU, IMPERMEABLES AUX LIQUIDES COMPRENANT DES STRUCTURES PERMEABLES A LA VAPEUR D'EAU, IMPERMEABLES AUX LIQUIDES ET CONTENANT DES COMPOSITIONS THERMOPLASTIQUES A VISCOSITE BASSE | [2001/42] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2001/42: Derzeit sind die WIPO-Publikationsdaten A3 nicht verfügbar. | EPB 2001/42: WIPO A3 publication data is not currently available. | EPB 2001/42: L'OMPI données de publication A3 ne sont pas actuellement disponibles. | Entry into regional phase | 11.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 11.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 11.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/42] | 03.01.2004 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2004/28] | 04.02.2004 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2004/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2003 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4123410 (LEE JR GIM F); | [X]EP0226439 (GRACE W R & CO [US]); | [A]US5424346 (SINCLAIR RICHARD G [US]); | [A]EP0805182 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0806283 (KUREHA CHEMICAL IND CO LTD [JP]) |