EP1095252 - COLLECTOR FOR AN AUTOMATED ON-LINE BATH ANALYSIS SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2005 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2005 [2005/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters Missouri 63376 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2001/18] | For all designated states MEMC Electronic Materials, Inc. 501 Pearl Drive, P.O. Box 8 St. Peters, Missouri 63376 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUTH, Kenneth, A. 634 W. Booneslick Road Warrenton, MO 63383 / US | 02 /
SCHMIDT, Philip, R. 532 Crown Passage Drive St. Charles, MO 63303 / US | [2001/18] | Representative(s) | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Smaggasgale, Gillian Helen, et al W.P. Thompson & Co, Celcon House, 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | ||
Former [2001/18] | Eyles, Christopher Thomas W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955534.5 | 04.06.1999 | [2001/18] | WO1999US12735 | Priority number, date | US19980093520 | 08.06.1998 Original published format: US 93520 | [2001/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9964838 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1095252 | Date: | 02.05.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | G01N1/20, G01N33/18, H01L21/00 | [2001/18] | CPC: |
G01N1/2035 (EP,KR,US);
Y10T436/117497 (EP,US);
Y10T436/25875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/18] | Title | German: | KOLLEKTOR FÜR EIN AUTOMATISIERTES ON-LINE-BAD-ANALYSESYSTEM | [2001/18] | English: | COLLECTOR FOR AN AUTOMATED ON-LINE BATH ANALYSIS SYSTEM | [2001/18] | French: | COLLECTEUR POUR SYSTEME AUTOMATIQUE D'ANALYSE DE BAINS EN LIGNE | [2001/18] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.1999 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/18] | 23.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.01.2005 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2005/27] | 04.02.2005 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2005/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2004 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US5723093 (DE BRUYNE THIERRY [FR], et al) [X] 1 * column 4, line 54 - column 5, line 28; figure -; claims 1,14 * [Y] 2-4,8-10,15; | [Y]US3849002 (HACH C) [Y] 2-4,8-10,15 * column 2, line 17 - line 25; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US3583235 (TANILA AIMO JUHAN) [A] 1-4,8-10,15 * column 2, line 11 - line 71; figure . *; | [A]US3691391 (KISHI HIROTOSHI) [A] 1 * column 2, line 66 - column 3, line 7; figure 1 * * column 3, line 47 - line 55 *; | [A]EP0474607 (BEDENDO ARMANDO [IT], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * |