EP1084581 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FAST MOTION ESTIMATION IN VIDEO CODING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.11.2004 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2008 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT, PT | published on 30.04.2008 [2008/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Innomedia Pte Ltd. 10 Science park Road 03-04/05, The Alpha Singapore 117684 / SG | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | For all designated states Innomedia Pte Ltd. 10 Science park Road #03-04/05, The Alpha Singapore 117684 / SG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUNG, Patrick Block 264, Waterloo Street, 10-201 Singapore 180264 / SG | 02 /
YU, Shaun Blk 117, Bukit Batok West Avenue 6, 08-242 Singapore 180264 / SG | [2001/12] | Representative(s) | Harris, Ian Richard D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2001/12] | Harris, Ian Richard D. Young & Co., 21 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1DA / GB | Application number, filing date | 99955580.8 | 03.06.1999 | [2001/12] | WO1999IB01189 | Priority number, date | US19980092513 | 05.06.1998 Original published format: US 92513 | [2001/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9965246 | Date: | 16.12.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1084581 | Date: | 21.03.2001 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.1999 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1084581 | Date: | 14.01.2004 | Language: | EN | [2004/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.12.1999 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/36 | [2001/12] | CPC: |
H04N19/533 (EP,US);
H04N19/53 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/12] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR SCHNELLEN BEWEGUNGSSCHÄTZUNG FÜR VIDEOCODIERUNG | [2001/12] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR FAST MOTION ESTIMATION IN VIDEO CODING | [2001/12] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF POUR L'ESTIMATION DE MOUVEMENTS RAPIDES EN CODAGE VIDEO | [2001/12] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2000 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2000 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2000 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.01.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.12.2000 | Examination requested [2001/12] | 12.02.2001 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2001 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.10.2001 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.10.2003 | Fee for grant paid | 14.10.2003 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.10.2004 | No opposition filed within time limit [2005/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.01.2004 | BE | 14.01.2004 | CH | 14.01.2004 | CY | 14.01.2004 | FI | 14.01.2004 | FR | 14.01.2004 | IT | 14.01.2004 | LI | 14.01.2004 | NL | 14.01.2004 | DK | 14.04.2004 | GR | 14.04.2004 | SE | 14.04.2004 | DE | 15.04.2004 | ES | 25.04.2004 | GB | 03.06.2004 | IE | 03.06.2004 | LU | 03.06.2004 | PT | 14.06.2004 | MC | 30.06.2004 | [2008/18] |
Former [2007/23] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
CY | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
FR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
GB | 03.06.2004 | ||
IE | 03.06.2004 | ||
LU | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/14] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
FR | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
GB | 03.06.2004 | ||
IE | 03.06.2004 | ||
LU | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2006/12] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
NL | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
GB | 03.06.2004 | ||
IE | 03.06.2004 | ||
LU | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/45] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
GB | 03.06.2004 | ||
IE | 03.06.2004 | ||
LU | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/24] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
IE | 03.06.2004 | ||
LU | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/23] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
LU | 03.06.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/12] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
DE | 15.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/11] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
MC | 30.06.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
DK | 14.04.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2005/01] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
BE | 14.01.2004 | ||
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/46] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
ES | 25.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/44] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
CH | 14.01.2004 | ||
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
LI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/43] | AT | 14.01.2004 | |
FI | 14.01.2004 | ||
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/41] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
GR | 14.04.2004 | ||
SE | 14.04.2004 | ||
Former [2004/40] | FI | 14.01.2004 | |
SE | 14.04.2004 | Cited in | International search | [X] - YU L ET AL, "HIERARCHICAL MOTION ESTIMATION ALGORITHMS WITH ESPECIALLY LOW HARDWARE COSTS", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON CONSUMER ELECTRONICS, (19980201), vol. 44, no. 1, ISSN 0098-3063, pages 125 - 129, XP000779258 [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0III] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/30.663738 | [XA] - THOMA R ET AL, "MOTION COMPENSATING INTERPOLATION CONSIDERING COVERED AND UNCOVERED BACKGROUND", SIGNAL PROCESSING. IMAGE COMMUNICATION, (19891001), vol. 1, no. 2, ISSN 0923-5965, pages 191 - 212, XP000234868 [X] 1,13,23 * paragraph [03.1] * * paragraph [03.2] * * figures 2,3 * [A] 2-12,14-22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0923-5965(89)90009-X | [A] - PLANSKY H ET AL, "BILDDATENREDUKTION UND IHRE ANWENDUNG BEI HDTV", FREQUENZ, (19920301), vol. 46, no. 3 / 04, ISSN 0016-1136, pages 102 - 109, XP000305494 [A] 1-23 * paragraph [1.6.3] * * figures 6-9 * | Examination | - KOGA T. ET AL, "MOTION-COMPENSATED INTERFRAME CODING FOR VIDEO CONFERENCING", IEEE NATIONAL TELECOMMUNICATIONS CONFERENCE. (N.T.C.), NEW ORLEANS, (19811129), vol. 4, XP000989476 | - JAIN J,R.; JAIN A.K., "DISPLACEMENT MEASUREMENT AND ITS APPLICATION IN INTERFRAME IMAGE CODING", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COMMUNICATIONS, NEW YORK, US, (19811201), vol. 29, no. 12, pages 1799 - 1808, XP000601714 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCOM.1981.1094950 |