EP1117917 - METHOD FOR REGENERATING AN NOx STORAGE CATALYTIC CONVERTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.05.2003 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.05.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.07.2003 [2003/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/30] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÜRZ, Willibald Seilerberg 2 D-93089 Aufhausen / DE | 02 /
ELLMER, Dietmar Plattnerbergweg 5 D-93199 Schillertswiesen / DE | [2001/30] | Application number, filing date | 99955708.5 | 14.09.1999 | [2001/30] | WO1999DE02928 | Priority number, date | DE1998144082 | 25.09.1998 Original published format: DE 19844082 | [2001/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0019075 | Date: | 06.04.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1117917 | Date: | 25.07.2001 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.04.2000 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2001/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1117917 | Date: | 17.07.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2000 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/02, F02D41/14, F01N3/10 | [2001/30] | CPC: |
B01D53/9495 (EP);
F01N13/009 (EP);
F01N3/0842 (EP);
F01N3/10 (KR);
F02D41/0275 (EP);
F02D41/1441 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2002/29] |
Former [2001/30] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM REGENERIEREN EINES NOx-SPEICHERKATALYSATORS | [2001/30] | English: | METHOD FOR REGENERATING AN NOx STORAGE CATALYTIC CONVERTER | [2001/30] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE REGENERER UN CATALYSEUR A ACCUMULATION DE NOx | [2001/30] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2001 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2001 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2001 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2000 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 04.01.2001 | Examination requested [2001/30] | 21.09.2001 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 28.01.2002 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.02.2002 | Fee for grant paid | 04.02.2002 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2003 | No opposition filed within time limit [2003/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [PA]EP0898067 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [PA] 1-8 * column 1, line 21 - column 3, line 29 * * column 4, line 57 - column 13, line 1 * * figures 1,3,9 *; | [PA]WO9855742 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [PA] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0636770 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * column 1, line 9 - column 2, line 4 * * column 2, line 34 - line 56 * * column 3, line 46 - column 21, line 32 *; | [A]EP0733787 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1,8 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0585900 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0814248 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]) [A] 1,9 * the whole document * |